This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2021 at 09:23:30 (UTC).

Schumacher Homes Operations, Inc. et al v. Riddle et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 Schumacher Homes Operations, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Riddle. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert C. Chambers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00724

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Chambers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Schumacher Homes of West Virginia, Inc.

Schumacher Homes Operations, Inc.

Defendants

DS Business, LLC doing business as Saxon Drawings, c/o

Misty D. Riddle

Donald W. Saxon

Donald W. Saxon doing business as Saxon Drawings

Justin L. Riddle

DS Business, LLC doing business as Saxon Drawings, c/o Donald W. Saxon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell D. Jessee

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON

P. O. Box 1588

Charleston, WV 25326-1588

James E. McDaniel

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON

P. O. Box 1588

Charleston, WV 25326-1588

Defendant Attorney

Robert R. Waters

Attorney at WATERS LAW OFFICE

633 Seventh Street

Huntington, WV 25701

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Email to Register of Copyrights

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Proposed Summons as to Donald Saxon

1 #6

Proposed Summons as to DS Business, LLC

1 #5

Proposed Summons as to Misty Riddle

1 #4

Proposed Summons as to Justin Riddle

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Service of Defendant Justin Riddle's First Requests for Production to Plaintiffs by Justin L. Riddle. (Modified on 12/17/2020 to remove party filer) (Waters, Robert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Service of Defendant Justin Riddle's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs by Justin L. Riddle. (Waters, Robert) (Modified on 12/17/2020 to remove party filer) (mkw).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER by Justin L. Riddle, Misty D. Riddle to #1 Complaint. (Waters, Robert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Robert R. Waters on behalf of Justin L. Riddle, Misty D. Riddle. (Waters, Robert)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Matthew Clark, Attorney on 11/12/2020. DS Business, LLC waiver mailed on 11/12/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Jessee, Russell)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Matthew Clark, Attorney on 11/12/2020. Donald W. Saxon waiver mailed on 11/12/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Jessee, Russell)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Schumacher Homes of West Virginia, Inc. (Jessee, Russell)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Schumacher Homes Operations, Inc. (Jessee, Russell)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON FILING PATENT/TRADEMARK - AO Form 121. (jsa) (Additional attachment added on 11/4/2020: #1 Email to Register of Copyrights) (mkw).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DS Business, LLC, Justin L. Riddle, Misty D. Riddle, Donald W. Saxon, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Misty Riddle, #2 Summons as to DS Business, LLC, #3 Summons as to Donald Saxon) (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT AND PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7790912. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Summons as to Justin Riddle, #5 Proposed Summons as to Misty Riddle, #6 Proposed Summons as to DS Business, LLC, #7 Proposed Summons as to Donald Saxon, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James E. McDaniel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell D. Jessee