This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2021 at 08:00:36 (UTC).

Schultz v. Bayer Cropscience LP et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Schultz filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Bayer Cropscience LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah E. Pitlyk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00745

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah E. Pitlyk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tyler Schultz

Defendants

Corteva, Inc.

Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.

Cargill Incorporated

BASF Corporation

CHS Inc.

Growmark Inc.

Growmark ES, LLC

Univar Solutions, Inc.

Winfield Solutions, LLC

Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.

Bayer CropScience L.P.

Bayer CropScience Inc

Syngenta Corporation

Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.

Tenkiz, Inc.

Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey D. Bores

Karl L Cambronne

Wilbert B Markovits

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin W. Hulse

X. Kevin Zhao

Todd A Wind

Jaime Stilson

Jon M. Woodruff

Peter J Schwingler

Luke Westerman

Richard G Jensen

Jevon Bindman

James J. Long

Andrew Thomas Dufresne

Brandon J. Wheeler

David L Hashmall

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#70

69 #1

*Restricted*

#69

#68

#66

#64

#59

#58

#53

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#4

#3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #70 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mary Fee ;attorney/firm Mary Fee by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary) filed by BASF Corporation ; ORDERED GRANTED, Attorney Mary Fee terminated.Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 8/20/21. (ARL) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mary Fee ;attorney/firm Mary Fee by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (DJO) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-00681. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. (DJO) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the Eastern District of Missouri per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk.(MMP) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) TEXT-ONLY ORDER in Response to #66 Letter to Magistrate Judge. With the permission of presiding District Judge Michael J. Davis, and in response to #66 the parties' letter reflecting their agreement and intention that Defendant Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. was to be added as a defendant in this matter with the filing of the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, the Clerk of Court is directed to add Defendant Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. as a defendant in this matter. This matter remains stayed pursuant to #58 the May 5, 2021 Order of Judge Davis staying all proceedings and deadlines, including but not limited to the filing of additional motions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/26/2021. (EB) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tyler Schultz . (Bleichner, Bryan) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #53 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathy Osborn for CHS Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/6/2021. (JGK) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #59 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Federated Co-Operatives LTD..(Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #59 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Federated Co-Operatives LTD..(Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Terence R.Coates. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8601070 filed by Tyler Schultz. (Bleichner, Bryan) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/15/2021. (HAM) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Michael J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright, Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-681 (MJD/TNL). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/11/2021 and Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 3/15/2021.(MMP) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Joint Motion to Extend Response Deadlines #6 Motion for Extension of Time (General). (Lindsay, Michael) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Growmark ES, LLC, Growmark Inc.. (Lindsay, Michael) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#5) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Wilbert B. Markovits and Terence R. Coates as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Growmark ES, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc., Simplot AB Retain Sub, Inc., Tenkiz, Inc. (MMP) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives LTD., Syngenta Corporation, Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC. (MMP) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd,4th Antitrust, Securities list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-681 (WMW/KMM). (MMP) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives LTD., Growmark ES, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc., Simplot AB Retain Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkiz, Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8586413) filed by Tyler Schultz. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cambronne, Karl) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less