This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2020 at 09:46:42 (UTC).

Schultz et al v. Diamond Rubber Products Co

Case Summary

On 04/15/2020 Schultz filed a Personal Injury - Airplane Product Liability lawsuit against Diamond Rubber Products Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Annemarie Carney Axon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00511

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Annemarie Carney Axon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Andrea D Conrad

Kasey L Holley

Mitchell S Schultz

Michael Phillips

Defendant

Diamond Rubber Products Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nolan E Awbrey

Attorney at AWBREY LAW

2 North 20Th Street, Ste. 950

Birmingham, AL 352003

James J Thompson, Jr

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JAMES J. THOMPSON, JR.

2025 3Rd. Avenue North, Ste 216

Birmingham, AL 35203

Richard E Genter

610 Old York Road, Suite 200

Jenkintown, PA 19046

Defendant Attorney

Robert M Ronnlund

Attorney at SCOTT SULLIVAN STREETMAN & FOX PC

P.O. Box 380548

Birmingham, AL 35238

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing

#16

14 #1

Supplement Certificate of Good Standing

#14

8 #5

Exhibit

8 #4

Exhibit

8 #3

Exhibit

8 #2

Text of Proposed Order

8 #1

Supplement

5 #5

Exhibit 5

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State complaint

#1

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ORDER - The court GRANTS #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bradley J. Stoll by Michael Phillips. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/4/20. (SAC) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3603000. (Awbrey, Nolan) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Bradley J. Stoll by Michael Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Awbrey, Nolan) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ORDER - The court GRANTS #14 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Richard Genter. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/22/20. (SAC) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3595320 (ALNd B4601106095). (Awbrey, Nolan) Modified on 5/22/2020 (KEK). (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard Genter by Andrea D Conrad, Kasey L Holley, Michael Phillips, Mitchell S Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Awbrey, Nolan) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER granting the parties' #12 joint motion for an extension of the briefing schedule on Plaintiffs' #8 motion to remand. Defendant's response is now due on or before June 5, 2020. Plaintiffs' reply, if one is necessary, is due on or before June 12, 2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/18/2020. (RLW) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Diamond Rubber Products Co. (Ronnlund, Robert) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Diamond Rubber Products Co. filed by Diamond Rubber Products Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ronnlund, Robert) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER. This matter comes before the court on Plaintiffs' #8 motion to remand. Defendant's response is due on or before May 22, 2020. Plaintiffs' reply, if one is necessary, is due on or before May 29, 2020. The court DEFERS briefing on Plaintiffs' #9 motion for a stay until after this court has resolved its jurisdictional questions and the motion to remand. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/8/2020. (RLW) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Remand by Kasey L Holley, Michael Phillips, Mitchell S Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Awbrey, Nolan) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to the discussion at the teleconference held on May 7, 2020, the court ORDERS Defendant Diamond Rubber Products Co. to file, on or before May 14, 2020, evidence establishing the citizenship of Plaintiff A.L. Conrad's mother. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/7/2020. (RLW) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon: Telephone Conference re OTSC held on 5/7/2020. (SAC) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER - The court sets a Telephone Conference for May 7, 2020, 10:00 AM before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. Counsel will receive the numbers required to join the call via e-mail. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/6/20. (SAC) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Diamond Rubber Products Co. filed by Diamond Rubber Products Co (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Ronnlund, Robert) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Diamond removed the case to federal court based on diversity jurisdiction. (Doc. #1 at 1). Because the court cannot tell from the notice of removal and the face of the complaint whether diversity jurisdiction exists, the court ORDERS Diamond to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, on or before May 4, 2020, why the court should not remand this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 4/20/2020. (KEK) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Diamond Rubber Products Co. filed by Diamond Rubber Products Co (Ronnlund, Robert) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3574047 (ALNd B4601105427) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diamond Rubber Products Co from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2020-901276, filed by Diamond Rubber Products Co. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - State complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(KEK). (Ronnlund, Robert) Modified on 4/16/2020 (KEK). (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Evidentiary Material re: #1 Notice of Removal, Corrected Exhibit 3. (Ronnlund, Robert) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diamond Rubber Products Co from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2020-901276, filed by Diamond Rubber Products Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State complaint, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(KEK) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHARD E. GENTER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nolan E. Awbrey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James J. Thompson, Jr.