This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 07:29:32 (UTC).

Schroeder v. Riseco

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 Schroeder filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Riseco. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Broomes and Gwynne E. Birzer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-01132

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Broomes

Referral Judge

Gwynne E. Birzer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph H. Schroeder, II

Derby, KS 67037

Defendant

Riseco

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Joseph H. Schroeder, II. (sz) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Joseph H. Schroeder, II. (jk) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Joseph H. Schroeder, II. (jk) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER. No later than August 2, 2019, Plaintiff must file an amended complaint that complies with the pleading requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 as discussed in the written order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/15/19. Mailed to pro se party Joseph H. Schroeder, II; 300 S. Woodlawn, #222; Derby, KS 67037 by certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7012 3050 0001 1190 3924.(adc) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. In light of this Court's order requiring Plaintiff to file an amended complaint (ECF No. 5), the clerk is directed to stay service of process pending Plaintiff's filing of an amended complaint and the Court's review of the amendment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/15/19. Mailed to pro se party Joseph H. Schroeder, II; 300 S. Woodlawn, #222; Derby, KS 67037 by certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7012 3050 0001 1190 3924. (adc) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER. In light of the recent #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Joseph H. Schroeder, II; Plaintiff is ORDERED to disregard the Court's direction to amend his complaint (Order, ECF No. 6). This matter is closed and no further filings are required. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/15/19. Mailed to pro se party Joseph H. Schroeder, II; 300 S. Woodlawn, #222; Derby, KS 67037 by certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7012 3050 0001 1190 3924. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(adc) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER. No later than August 2, 2019, Plaintiff must file an amended complaint that complies with the pleading requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 as discussed in the written order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/15/19. Mailed to pro se party Joseph H. Schroeder, II; 300 S. Woodlawn, #222; Derby, KS 67037 by certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7012 3050 0001 1190 3924.(adc) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. In light of this Court's order requiring Plaintiff to file an amended complaint (ECF No. 5), the clerk is directed to stay service of process pending Plaintiff's filing of an amended complaint and the Court's review of the amendment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/15/19. Mailed to pro se party Joseph H. Schroeder, II; 300 S. Woodlawn, #222; Derby, KS 67037 by certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7012 3050 0001 1190 3924. (adc) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Joseph H. Schroeder, II. (sz) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joseph H. Schroeder, II (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Financial Status). (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (jk) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Joseph H. Schroeder, II. (jk) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Joseph H. Schroeder, II. (jk) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.