This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2021 at 09:19:43 (UTC).

SCHREIER v. MENARD, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 SCHREIER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MENARD, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Magnus-Stinson and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02096

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Magnus-Stinson

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TONYA SCHREIER

Defendant

MENARD, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathan D. Foushee

Attorney at KEN NUNN LAW OFFICE

104 South Franklin Rd.

Bloomington, IN 47404

Defendant Attorneys

Leslie B. Pollie

Attorney at KOPKA PINKUS DOLIN PC (Carmel)

550 Congressional Blvd., Suite 310

Carmel, IN 46032

Jessica N. Hamilton

Attorney at KOPKA PINKUS DOLIN PC (Carmel)

550 Congressional Blvd., Suite 310

Carmel, IN 46032

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS SUBMITTED. Dispositive Motions due by 7/23/2022. Discovery due by 5/23/2022. TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 2/24/2022 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/3/2021.(CBU) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#15

(#15) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant MENARD, INC. . (Hamilton, Jessica) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Jessica N. Hamilton hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Hamilton, Jessica) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2021 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties themselves may participate at their option. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/6/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#12

(#12) Statement Responding to the Allegations of Notice of Removal by All Plaintiffs. (Foushee, Nathan) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Nathan D. Foushee hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (fax number) (Foushee, Nathan) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan D. Foushee on behalf of Plaintiff TONYA SCHREIER. (Foushee, Nathan) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint , filed by MENARD, INC..(Hamilton, Jessica) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#8

(#8) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MAC) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#7

(#7) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie B. Pollie on behalf of Defendant MENARD, INC.. (Pollie, Leslie) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Filing by MENARD, INC. (Hamilton, Jessica) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MENARD, INC.. (Hamilton, Jessica) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant MENARD, INC.. (Hamilton, Jessica) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica N. Hamilton on behalf of Defendant MENARD, INC.. (Hamilton, Jessica) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from HENDRICKSSUPERIOR COURT 4, case number 32D04-2106-CT-000078, filed by MENARD, INC.. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6670171) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hamilton, Jessica) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS SUBMITTED. Dispositive Motions due by 7/23/2022. Discovery due by 5/23/2022. TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 2/24/2022 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/3/2021.(CBU) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant MENARD, INC. . (Hamilton, Jessica) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Jessica N. Hamilton hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Hamilton, Jessica) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2021 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. The parties themselves may participate at their option. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/6/2021.(SWM) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Statement Responding to the Allegations of Notice of Removal by All Plaintiffs. (Foushee, Nathan) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Nathan D. Foushee hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (fax number) (Foushee, Nathan) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan D. Foushee on behalf of Plaintiff TONYA SCHREIER. (Foushee, Nathan) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint , filed by MENARD, INC..(Hamilton, Jessica) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (MAC) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie B. Pollie on behalf of Defendant MENARD, INC.. (Pollie, Leslie) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Filing by MENARD, INC. (Hamilton, Jessica) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MENARD, INC.. (Hamilton, Jessica) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant MENARD, INC.. (Hamilton, Jessica) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica N. Hamilton on behalf of Defendant MENARD, INC.. (Hamilton, Jessica) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from HENDRICKSSUPERIOR COURT 4, case number 32D04-2106-CT-000078, filed by MENARD, INC.. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6670171) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hamilton, Jessica) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Menard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica N. Hamilton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leslie B. Pollie