This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:16:04 (UTC).

SCHREANE v. WATSON

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 SCHREANE filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against WATSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon and Doris L. Pryor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00610

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CLARENCE D. SCHREANE

Terre Haute, IN 47808

Respondent

T. J. WATSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sara Varner

Attorney at INDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS

111 Monument Circle, Suite 3200

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Order Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Entry and Order to Show Cause - The petitioner shall have through January 24, 2020, to pay the $5.00 filing fee. The clerk shall forward a copy of this Order to the United States Attorney for this District. The Indiana Federal Community Defenders Office, Inc. ("IFCD") is hereby appointed to represent the petitioner in this action. The IFCD shall have through January 3, 2020, in which to appear. The United States shall have through February 3, 2020, in which to answer the allegations of the petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, and the petitioner shall have twenty-eight (28) calendar days after service of the answer in which to reply. Copies distributed pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 12/27/2019. (KAA) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit - Affidavits in support and case law

2 #2

Cover Letter

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Petitioner CLARENCE D. SCHREANE. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(REO) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

2 #3

Envelope

#9

(#9) AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The United States shall have through March 9, 2020, in which to answer the allegations of the petitioners petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, and the petitioner shall have twenty-eight (28) calendar days after service of the answer in which to reply. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 2/7/2020.(KAA) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#7

(#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by CLARENCE D. SCHREANE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

7 #1

Envelope

1 #1

Cover Letter

3 #1

Cover Letter

3 #2

Envelope

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by CLARENCE D. SCHREANE. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(REO) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#2

(#2) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM of law in Support, re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Petitioner CLARENCE D. SCHREANE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Affidavits in support and case law, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(REO) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Varner on behalf of Petitioner CLARENCE D. SCHREANE. (Varner, Sara) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The United States shall have through March 9, 2020, in which to answer the allegations of the petitioners petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, and the petitioner shall have twenty-eight (28) calendar days after service of the answer in which to reply. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 2/7/2020.(KAA) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docket(#8) RECEIPT #IP068193 for habeas filing fee in the amount of $5.00, paid by petitioner. (AKH) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by CLARENCE D. SCHREANE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Varner on behalf of Petitioner CLARENCE D. SCHREANE. (Varner, Sara) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Entry and Order to Show Cause - The petitioner shall have through January 24, 2020, to pay the $5.00 filing fee. The clerk shall forward a copy of this Order to the United States Attorney for this District. The Indiana Federal Community Defenders Office, Inc. ("IFCD") is hereby appointed to represent the petitioner in this action. The IFCD shall have through January 3, 2020, in which to appear. The United States shall have through February 3, 2020, in which to answer the allegations of the petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, and the petitioner shall have twenty-eight (28) calendar days after service of the answer in which to reply. Copies distributed pursuant to distribution list. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 12/27/2019. (KAA) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Petitioner CLARENCE D. SCHREANE. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(REO) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM of law in Support, re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Petitioner CLARENCE D. SCHREANE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Affidavits in support and case law, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(REO) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by CLARENCE D. SCHREANE. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(REO) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.