This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/08/2023 at 09:37:33 (UTC).

Schramm v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/09/2023 Schramm filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James S. Moody, Jr and Philip R. Lammens. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-00163

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James S. Moody, Jr

Referral Judge

Philip R. Lammens

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Schramm

Defendant

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Claudeth J. Henry

Defendant Attorney

Jeannine Cline Jacobson

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A and B

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (LAB) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

#4

(#4) PROOF of service by Charles Schramm (Henry, Claudeth) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jacobson, Jeannine) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Seal Case by Charles Schramm. (Henry, Claudeth) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of settlement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jacobson, Jeannine) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of settlement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jacobson, Jeannine) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Seal Case by Charles Schramm. (Henry, Claudeth) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to April 27, 2023. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 4/3/2023. (SMB) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jacobson, Jeannine) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROOF of service by Charles Schramm (Henry, Claudeth) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (LAB) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:23-cv-0163-JSM-PRL. (SJB) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20593612) filed by Charles Schramm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Henry, Claudeth) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less