This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/20/2020 at 09:29:13 (UTC).

Femmer et al v. Sephora USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 Femmer filed an Other lawsuit against Sephora USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John M. Bodenhausen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00676

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John M. Bodenhausen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tiffany Femmer

Kathryn Schott

Defendant

Sephora USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam M. Goffstein

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF A. M. GOFFSTEIN

7777 Bonhomme Avenue, Suite 1910

St. Louis, MO 63105

Daniel John Orlowsky

Attorney at ORLOWSKY LAW LLC

7777 Bonhomme Ave., Suite 1910

St. Louis, MO 63105

Defendant Attorneys

Abraham James Spung

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP - St Louis

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

Robert E. Shapiro

Attorney at BARACK AND FERRAZZANO

200 West Madison Street, Suite 3900

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael Jonathan Barker Pitt

Attorney at BARACK AND FERRAZZANO

200 West Madison Street, Suite 3900

Chicago, IL 60606

Maile Solis

Attorney at BARACK AND FERRAZZANO

200 West Madison Street, Suite 3900

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' joint motion for extensions of time and for limited stay [Doc. #17 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's response to plaintiffs' motions to remand and for limited discovery shall be filed no later than July 20, 2020. Any reply shall be filed no later than August 13, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's time to file a responsive pleading is stayed until 14 days after the Court rules on plaintiffs motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 7/1/2020. (NEP) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#17

(#17) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Motion to Engage in Limited Jurisdictional Discovery, Joint MOTION to Stay Deadline to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition by Defendant Sephora USA, Inc.. (Spung, Abraham) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

16 #2

Exhibit 2

16 #1

Exhibit 1

#16

(#16) MOTION for Discovery by Plaintiffs Tiffany Femmer, Kathryn Schott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Orlowsky, Daniel) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

15 #2

Exhibit 2

15 #1

Exhibit 1

#15

(#15) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiffs Tiffany Femmer, Kathryn Schott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Orlowsky, Daniel) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiffs Tiffany Femmer, Kathryn Schott. (Orlowsky, Daniel) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

12 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#12

(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Maile H. Solis. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7956397) by Defendant Sephora USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Solis, Maile) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

11 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#11

(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert E. Shapiro. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7956362) by Defendant Sephora USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Shapiro, Robert) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

10 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael J. B. Pitt. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7956316) by Defendant Sephora USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pitt, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Sephora USA, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Spung, Abraham) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Defendant Sephora USA, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Petition by Defendant Sephora USA, Inc.. (Spung, Abraham) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#5

(#5) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Tiffany Femmer, Kathryn Schott.(BAK) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' joint motion for extensions of time and for limited stay [Doc. #17 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's response to plaintiffs' motions to remand and for limited discovery shall be filed no later than July 20, 2020. Any reply shall be filed no later than August 13, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's time to file a responsive pleading is stayed until 14 days after the Court rules on plaintiffs motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 7/1/2020. (NEP) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Motion to Engage in Limited Jurisdictional Discovery, Joint MOTION to Stay Deadline to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition by Defendant Sephora USA, Inc.. (Spung, Abraham) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Discovery by Plaintiffs Tiffany Femmer, Kathryn Schott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Orlowsky, Daniel) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiffs Tiffany Femmer, Kathryn Schott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Orlowsky, Daniel) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiffs Tiffany Femmer, Kathryn Schott. (Orlowsky, Daniel) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • Docket(#13) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions of Michael J.B. Pitt, Robert E. Shapiro, and Maile H. Solis for leave to appear pro hac vice [10, 11, 12] are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 06/10/2020. (LXC) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Maile H. Solis. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7956397) by Defendant Sephora USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Solis, Maile) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert E. Shapiro. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7956362) by Defendant Sephora USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Shapiro, Robert) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael J. B. Pitt. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7956316) by Defendant Sephora USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pitt, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Sephora USA, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Spung, Abraham) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant Sephora USA, Inc., for extension of time until July 10,2020, to file responsive pleading #7 is GRANTED. Sephora USA, Inc. answer due 7/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 05/26/2020. (LXC) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Defendant Sephora USA, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Petition by Defendant Sephora USA, Inc.. (Spung, Abraham) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Docket(#6) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. (BAK) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Tiffany Femmer, Kathryn Schott.(BAK) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM Certificate of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court and Proof of Service by Defendant Sephora USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal filing)(Spung, Abraham) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Sephora USA, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal filing)(Spung, Abraham) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Sephora USA, Inc.. Parent companies: LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton Inc., an indirect wholly-owned subsidiary of LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton SE, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton SE,. (Spung, Abraham) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, MO, case number 20SL-CC01736, with receipt number AMOEDC-7925345, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Sephora USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket and File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Spung, Abraham) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEPHORA USA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer A. James Spung

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Eliot Shapiro(Designation Retained)