This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/09/2020 at 07:05:07 (UTC).

Schoenmann v. Boal et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Schoenmann filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Boal. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Breyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00196

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lynn E. Schoenmann

San Francisco, CA 94129

Defendants

Steven R. Boal

Quotient Technology, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Seena Forouzan

Attorney at The Meade Firm p.c.

12 Funston Avenue, Suite A

San Francisco, CA 94129

Tibor L. Nagy

Attorney at Dontzin Nagy & Fleissig LLP

980 Madison Avenue, 2Nd Floor

New York, NY 10075

Samuel Ivan Ferguson

Attorney at The Meade Firm p.c.

12 Funston Avenue, Suite A

San Francisco, CA 94129

Tyler Roberts Meade

Attorney at The Meade Firm P.C.

12 Funston Ave.

San Francisco, CA 94129

Stephen Bryan Popernik

Attorney at Dontzin Nagy and Fleissig LLP

980 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10075

Anne Orelind Decker

Attorney at The Meade Firm

12 Funston Avenue, Suite A

San Francisco, CA 94129

Defendant Attorneys

Brook Dooley

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Elliot Remsen Peters

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Victor T. Chiu

Attorney at Keker Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

David Samuel Houska

Attorney at Cooley LLP

101 California Street, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Matthew David Caplan

Attorney at Cooley LLP

101 California Street, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-5800

Jayme Breanna Staten

Attorney at Cooley

4401 Eastgate Mall

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

#35

#34

#33

#32

31 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B (Transcript)

31 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A (Meet and Confer)

#30

#29

#25

#5

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO BANKRUPTCY COURT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/14/2020. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) USBC Transmittal of Documents: Recommendation of Bankruptcy Judge pursuant to B.L.R. 50112(b) and Docket Sheet. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2020) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY STEVEN BOAL by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2020) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Proposed Order re #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Lynn E. Schoenmann. (Meade, Tyler) (Filed on 2/11/2020) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Declaration of Tyler Meade in Support of #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint , #29 Notice (Other) filed byLynn E. Schoenmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Meet and Confer), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B (Transcript))(Related document(s) #30 , #29 ) (Meade, Tyler) (Filed on 2/11/2020) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Lynn E. Schoenmann. (Meade, Tyler) (Filed on 2/11/2020) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE by Lynn E. Schoenmann Notice of Application and Application For Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Meade, Tyler) (Filed on 2/11/2020) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Proposed Order re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Steven R. Boal. (Peters, Elliot) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven R. Boal (Peters, Elliot) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Request for Judicial Notice re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed bySteven R. Boal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Related document(s) #25 ) (Peters, Elliot) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Case REASSIGNED to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginian K DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docket(#9) This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lynn E. Schoenmann.. (Meade, Tyler) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Steven R. Boal. (Chiu, Victor) (Filed on 1/14/2020) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven R. Boal (Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 1/10/2020) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/24/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven R. Boal re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, (Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 1/9/2020) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Steven R. Boal (Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 1/9/2020) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 19CV359966. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14054104). Filed bySteven R. Boal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dooley, Brook) (Filed on 1/9/2020) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less