This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/08/2022 at 07:53:01 (UTC).

Schobel et al v. Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 Schobel filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lynn N Hughes and Peter Bray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00389

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

Referral Judge

Peter Bray

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Melvin Schobel

Phlyes Schobel

Defendant

Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jesse S. Corona

Attorney at The Corona Law Firm, PLLC

12807 Haynes Road, Bldg. E

Houston, TX 77066

Defendant Attorneys

E.R. Hamilton

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo, LLP

One Riverway, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77058

Martin R Sadler

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

One Riverway, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Index of Matters Being Filed

1 #2

List of All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(RachelWillborg, 4) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#3

(#3) General Reference to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Melvin Schobel, Phlyes Schobel, filed.(Corona, Jesse) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/31/2022 at 10:15 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#6

(#6) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, filed.(Sadler, Martin) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER. Pltf Expert Witness List due by 7/29/2022. Pltf Expert Report due by 7/29/2022. Deft Expert Witness List due by 8/26/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 8/26/2022. Discovery due by 10/28/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 12/9/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 12/9/2022.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER FOR DISCLOSURE. Parties to comply by 4/15/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER FOR DISCLOSURE. Parties to comply by 4/15/2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER. Pltf Expert Witness List due by 7/29/2022. Pltf Expert Report due by 7/29/2022. Deft Expert Witness List due by 8/26/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 8/26/2022. Discovery due by 10/28/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 12/9/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 12/9/2022.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 3/31/2022. Scheduling order and disclosure order to be entered. Appearances: E.R. Hamilton, Jesse S. Corona.(ERO:Yes), filed.(jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford, filed.(Sadler, Martin) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/31/2022 at 10:15 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Melvin Schobel, Phlyes Schobel, filed.(Corona, Jesse) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) General Reference to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(RachelWillborg, 4) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 284th Judicial District Court Montgomery County, TX, case number 211217456 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-27711894) filed by Property and Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 List of All Parties and Counsel, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sadler, Martin) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant