This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/06/2020 at 09:07:18 (UTC).

Schnelle v. Chevron USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2020 Schnelle filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Chevron USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David Counts and Ronald C. Griffin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00112

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Counts

Referral Judge

Ronald C. Griffin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelly Schnelle

Defendant

Chevron USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard J. Burch

Attorney at Bruckner Burch PLLC

8 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77046

Michael A. Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Andrew W. Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Richard M. Schreiber

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant Attorneys

Jesika J. Silva Blanco

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright U.S. LLP

1301 Mckinney St.,Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010

Kimberly Frances Cheeseman

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney Ste 5100

Houston, TX 77010

Michael Carter Crow

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jesika J. Silva Blanco on behalf of Chevron USA, Inc.. Attorney Jesika J. Silva Blanco added to party Chevron USA, Inc.(pty:dft) (Silva Blanco, Jesika) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly Frances Cheeseman on behalf of Chevron USA, Inc.. Attorney Kimberly Frances Cheeseman added to party Chevron USA, Inc.(pty:dft) (Cheeseman, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Chevron USA, Inc..(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Plaintiff's Class Definitions and Related Class Allegations by Chevron USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent of Nathan Morgan by Kelly Schnelle (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Kelly Schnelle (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Schnelle. Chevron USA, Inc. served on 5/22/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (Schreiber, Richard) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard M. Schreiber on behalf of Kelly Schnelle (Schreiber, Richard) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent of Timothy Biggs by Kelly Schnelle (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Chevron USA, Inc. (se) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kelly Schnelle. (Josephson, Michael) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/7/2020) (se). (Entered: 05/07/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Consent

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13545941), filed by Kelly Schnelle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/7/2020 with flattened form) (se). (Entered: 05/07/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jesika J. Silva Blanco on behalf of Chevron USA, Inc.. Attorney Jesika J. Silva Blanco added to party Chevron USA, Inc.(pty:dft) (Silva Blanco, Jesika) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly Frances Cheeseman on behalf of Chevron USA, Inc.. Attorney Kimberly Frances Cheeseman added to party Chevron USA, Inc.(pty:dft) (Cheeseman, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Chevron USA, Inc..(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Plaintiff's Class Definitions and Related Class Allegations by Chevron USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent of Nathan Morgan by Kelly Schnelle (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Kelly Schnelle (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Schnelle. Chevron USA, Inc. served on 5/22/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (Schreiber, Richard) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard M. Schreiber on behalf of Kelly Schnelle (Schreiber, Richard) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent of Timothy Biggs by Kelly Schnelle (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge David Counts. (se) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Chevron USA, Inc. (se) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (se) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kelly Schnelle. (Josephson, Michael) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/7/2020) (se). (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13545941), filed by Kelly Schnelle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/7/2020 with flattened form) (se). (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chevron USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Carter Crow

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly Cheeseman