This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/15/2019 at 07:10:07 (UTC).

Thomas Schneider v. Rash, Curtis and Associates

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 Thomas Schneider filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Rash, Curtis and Associates. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Fitzgerald and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01119

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Schneider

Defendants

Rash, Curtis & Associates

Rash, Curtis and Associates

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas M Wajda

Attorney at Wajda Law Group APC

11400 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 200M

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Nathan C Volheim

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group Ltd

2500 South Highland Avenue Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Defendant Attorneys

David Raymond Casady

Attorney at Berman Berman Berman Schneider and Lowary LLP

2390 Professional Drive

Roseville, CA 95661

Amanda Nicole Griffith

Attorney at Berman Berman Berman Schneider and Lowary LLP

2390 Professional Drive

Roseville, CA 95661

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Rash, Curtis and Associates. (Griffith, Amanda) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Rash, Curtis and Associates. Motion set for hearing on 5/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Griffith, Amanda) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Rash, Curtis and Associates answer now due 4/5/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Rash, Curtis and Associates.(Attorney Amanda Nicole Griffith added to party Rash, Curtis and Associates(pty:dft))(Griffith, Amanda) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thomas Schneider, upon Defendant Rash, Curtis and Associates served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ashley Lewis, Employee of Defendant Who is Designated By Law to Accept Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Rash, Curtis and Associates. (lh) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Nathan C. Volheim to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Thomas Schneider, designating Nicholas M. Wajda as local counsel #5 . (iv) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nathan Charles Volheim to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Thomas Schneider (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23212538) filed by Plaintiff Thomas Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Thomas Schneider. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Thomas Schneider, (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Thomas Schneider. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23212461 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Thomas Schneider. (Attorney Nicholas M Wajda added to party Thomas Schneider(pty:pla))(Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Rash, Curtis and Associates. (Griffith, Amanda) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Rash, Curtis and Associates. Motion set for hearing on 5/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Griffith, Amanda) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Rash, Curtis and Associates answer now due 4/5/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Rash, Curtis and Associates.(Attorney Amanda Nicole Griffith added to party Rash, Curtis and Associates(pty:dft))(Griffith, Amanda) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thomas Schneider, upon Defendant Rash, Curtis and Associates served on 3/1/2019, answer due 3/22/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ashley Lewis, Employee of Defendant Who is Designated By Law to Accept Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Rash, Curtis and Associates. (lh) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Nathan C. Volheim to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Thomas Schneider, designating Nicholas M. Wajda as local counsel #5 . (iv) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nathan Charles Volheim to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Thomas Schneider (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23212538) filed by Plaintiff Thomas Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Thomas Schneider. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Thomas Schneider, (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Thomas Schneider. (Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23212461 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Thomas Schneider. (Attorney Nicholas M Wajda added to party Thomas Schneider(pty:pla))(Wajda, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RASH CURTIS & ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Nicole Griffith