This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2023 at 20:17:20 (UTC).

Schneider v. OSG, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2022 Schneider filed an Other lawsuit against OSG, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Frederic Block and Vera M. Scanlon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-07686

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frederic Block

Referral Judge

Vera M. Scanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Spencer Lee Schneider

Defendants

OSG, LLC

Lorraine Imlay

Minerva Taylor

Gregory Koch

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elizabeth Geddes

Attorney at Shihata & Geddes LLP

155 Water Street

Brooklyn, NY 11201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16238756 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Spencer Lee Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Geddes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (SR) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: An In-Person Initial Conference is scheduled for 4/5/2023 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 3/21/2023. In the event that any Defendant(s) has not answered or otherwise appeared, Plaintiff must also mail a copy of this Order, its attachment and the full docket to the last known mailing address(es) for such Defendant(s) and file proof on ECF by the CMP filing date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 12/20/2022. (MG) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Nadia Shihata on behalf of Spencer Lee Schneider (aty to be noticed) (Shihata, Nadia) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Nadia Shihata on behalf of Spencer Lee Schneider (aty to be noticed) (Shihata, Nadia) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: An In-Person Initial Conference is scheduled for 4/5/2023 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 3/21/2023. In the event that any Defendant(s) has not answered or otherwise appeared, Plaintiff must also mail a copy of this Order, its attachment and the full docket to the last known mailing address(es) for such Defendant(s) and file proof on ECF by the CMP filing date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 12/20/2022. (MG) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SR) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (SR) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (SR) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SR) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16238756 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Spencer Lee Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Geddes, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less