This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/13/2021 at 09:58:16 (UTC).

Schneider v. Dahlstrom et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 Schneider filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Dahlstrom. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sharon L. Gleason and Ralph R. Beistline. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00170

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sharon L. Gleason

Ralph R. Beistline

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lucas Canton Schneider

Juneau, AK 99801

Defendants

Nancy Dahstrom

Bob Cordle

Nancy Dahlstrom

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#10

#9

8 #1

1

#8

#7

#6

5 #3

Exhibit 3

5 #2

Exhibit 2

#5

3 #1

Account Statement

#3

1 #7

Exhibit I1-2

1 #6

Exhibit F1

#1

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER re: NOTICE OF APPEAL: #12 Motion for Change of Judge is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction and without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 9/2/21. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #10 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, by Lucas Canton Schneider. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SPONTANEOUS DECLARATION by Lucas Canton Schneider. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Change of Judge by Lucas Canton Schneider.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER re: Case Screening, Motion for Emergency Preliminary Injunction, and All Other Pending Motions. Complaint at dkt #1 is dismissed. Amended Complaint or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal due by 9/15/2021. granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denied without prejudice #5 Motion for Production of Documents; granting #6 Motion for All Court Documents; denied without prejudice #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denied without prejudice #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denied as moot #9 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 8/11/21. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Amendment/Copies of Filed Documents by Lucas Canton Schneider.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Lucas Canton Schneider. (Attachments: #1 1)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Docket(#11) RRB TEXT ORDER: By agreement of the Judges, this case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Ralph R. Beistline for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on future filings: 3:21-cv-00170-RRB. (JLH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 8/11/2021 to give order a docket number. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Emergency Injunction by Lucas Canton Schneider.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for All Court Document by Lucas Canton Schneider.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Production of Documents by Lucas Canton Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: The Nature of Suit of this case is changed from 360 to 550 to reflect this is prisoner civil rights action. This change is administrative in nature only. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unissued summons re Defendant Nancy Nahstrom, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Bob Cordle)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lucas Canton Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bob Cordle, Nancy Dahstrom, filed by Lucas Canton Schneider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1-4, #2 Exhibit B1, #3 Exhibit C1-4, #4 Exhibit D1-3, #5 Exhibit E1-44, #6 Exhibit F1, #7 Exhibit I1-2)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less