This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2021 at 09:43:22 (UTC).

Holly Schneider v. Amazon Retail LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Holly Schneider filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Amazon Retail LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Percy Anderson and Maria A. Audero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05174

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Holly Schneider

Defendants

DOES 1-100, inclusive,

Amazon Retail LLC

Does 1 to 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melissa Arielle Huether

Attorney at Lavi and Ebrahimian LLP

8889 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Joseph Lavi

Attorney at Lavi and Ebrahimian LLP

8889 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Vincent Charles Granberry

Attorney at Lavi and Ebrahimian LLP

8889 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Defendant Attorneys

Lauren M. Blas

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Jessica M Pearigen

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

3161 Michelson Drive Suite 1200

Irvine, CA 92612

Katie Marie Magallanes

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

3161 Michelson Drive

Irvine, CA 92612-4412

Megan M Cooney

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

3161 Michelson Drive

Irvine, CA 92612-4412

Melanie Rose Sava

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

17 #1

Declaration of Alicia Garcia

17 #17

Main Document

#16

#15

14 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration

14 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration

14 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration

14 #1

Declaration Declaration of Melissa A. Huether in Support of Plaintiff Schneider&

14 #14

Main Document

13 #1

Exhibit A

13 #13

Main Document

#12

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • Docket(#27) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Megan M Cooney counsel for Defendant Amazon Retail LLC. Adding Megan Cooney as counsel of record for Amazon Retail LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Amazon Retail LLC. (Attorney Megan M Cooney added to party Amazon Retail LLC(pty:dft))(Cooney, Megan) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docket(#26) PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Judge Percy Anderson. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docket(#25) CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. 1. Establishing a Discovery Cut-off Date of April 18, 2022. 2. Setting Motion Cut-off date of April 25, 2022. 3. Setting Final Pretrial Conference for June 3, 2022, at 1:30 p.m. 4. Setting Jury Trial Date of June 28, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docket(#24) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. Based on the evidence and arguments presented in the parties' Responses, the Court hereby discharges the Order to Show Cause. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docket(#23) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court has received the parties' joint 26(f) report and finds that a scheduling conference is not necessary. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. The dates set by the Court are firm dates. Absent extraordinary circumstances, which must satisfy the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) and be brought to the Court's attention in a timely manner, the Court will not modify these dates. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for August 16, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docket(#22) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than May 2, 2022. (mrgo) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Implementation of Ethical Screen filed by Defendants Amazon Retail LLC. (Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Amazon Retail LLC. Related Case(s): 8:21-cv-01271-CJC-ADS (Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 20 days, filed by Plaintiff Holly Schneider.. (Huether, Melissa) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings Pursuant to L.R. 83-1.4 filed by Defendant Amazon Retail LLC. (Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION of Lauren M. Blas re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 (Supplemental) filed by Defendant Amazon Retail LLC. (Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Amazon Retail LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT N)(ghap) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Holly Schneider, upon Defendant Amazon Retail LLC served on 5/28/2021, answer due 6/18/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss-CSC Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/7/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT I) (ghap) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Amazon Retail LLC, Does 1 to 100, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Holly Schneider. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/5/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C) (ghap) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Amazon Retail LLC identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Amazon Retail LLC, (Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Amazon Retail LLC. (Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV17066 Receipt No: ACACDC-31528582 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Amazon Retail LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zane Brown in Support of Amazon Retail LLC's Notice of Removal of Class Action, #2 Declaration of Jarin Spriggs in Support of Amazon Retail LLC's Notice of Removal of Class Action, #3 Declaration of Lauren M. Blas in Support of Amazon Retail LLC's Notice of Removal of Class Action, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Proof of Service) (Attorney Lauren M. Blas added to party Amazon Retail LLC(pty:dft))(Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon Retail, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Megan M Cooney

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katie Marie Magallanes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren Margaret Blas