This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/17/2022 at 08:22:43 (UTC).

Maria Gurrola v. Scott Howard et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2022 Maria Gurrola filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Scott Howard. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and John E. McDermott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01825

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Gurrola

Petitioners and Defendants

Schneider National Carriers, Inc.

Scott Howard

Does 1 through 20, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jose Elias Sanchez

Attorney at Sanchez PLC

18000 Studebaker Road 7Th Floor

Cerritos, CA 90703

Petitioner and Defendant Attorneys

Jaion Chung

Attorney at Poole Shaffery

25350 Magic Mountain Parkway Suite 250

Valencia, CA 91355

Vache Vahan Muradian

Attorney at Poole Shaffery

25350 Magic Mountain Parkway Suite 250

Valencia, CA 91355

 

Court Documents

20 #1

Declaration Sanchez Declaration

20 #20

Main Document

14 #17

Proposed Order Proposed Order

14 #15

Exhibit Ex. N - Statement of Damages for December 2021 and February 2022

14 #9

Exhibit Ex. H - Defendants' Request for Statement of Damages

14 #8

Exhibit Ex. G - Defendants' Answer

14 #6

Exhibit Ex. E - Initial Served Papers to Defendant Schneider

14 #5

Exhibit Ex. D - Proof of Service on Defendants

14 #4

Exhibit Ex. C - Emails to Process Servers

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (rolm) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (rolm) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

3 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Statement of Damages

3 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - Defendant's Request for damages

3 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint

3 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) First CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers, Inc., (Attorney Jaion Chung added to party Schneider National Carriers, Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Chung, Jaion) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Chung, Jaion) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY Reply In Support of Motion To Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Maria Gurrola. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sanchez Declaration)(Sanchez, Jose) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Opposition In Opposition re: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #14 filed by Defendants Scott Howard, Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jaion Chung, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Chung, Jaion) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Maria Gurrola, identifying Maria Gurrola, Scott Howard and Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Sanchez, Jose) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The document (Dkt. No. #14 ) is accepted as filed. The Court orders the filer to file their Notice of Interested Parties by no later than close of business day (4:30 PM PST) on April 22, 2022. (jgr) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Lacking statement re conference of counsel, pursuant to Local Rule 7-3. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiff Maria Gurrola. Motion set for hearing on 5/27/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sanchez Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Traffic Collision Report, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Complaint, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - Emails to Process Servers, #5 Exhibit Ex. D - Proof of Service on Defendants, #6 Exhibit Ex. E - Initial Served Papers to Defendant Schneider, #7 Exhibit Ex. F - Initial Served Papers to Defendant Scott, #8 Exhibit Ex. G - Defendants' Answer, #9 Exhibit Ex. H - Defendants' Request for Statement of Damages, #10 Exhibit Ex. I - Email to Attorney Chung Regarding Invite to Drop Box, #11 Exhibit Ex. J - Email from Levine - Requesting Link to Drop Box, #12 Exhibit Ex. K - Emails - from Levine - Acknowledging Receipt and Download of Content, #13 Exhibit Ex. L - Medical Specials Provided to Defense, #14 Exhibit Ex. M - Email from Sanchez - Providing Statement of Damages, #15 Exhibit Ex. N - Statement of Damages for December 2021 and February 2022, #16 Exhibit Ex. O - Notice of Removal, #17 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Sanchez, Jose) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Change of Firm Name filed by Defendants Scott Howard, Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Chung, Jaion) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PRETRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets an in-person Scheduling Conference set for hearing on April 15, 2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by April 5, 2022. (jgr) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon the filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (rolm) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (rolm) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (rolm) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT, filed by Defendants Scott Howard, Schneider National Carriers, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 01/14/2022 SUBMITTED AS EXHIBIT B AS ATTACHMENT 3-2 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #3 ](rolm) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Scott Howard, Schneider National Carriers, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Maria Gurrola. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/29/2021 SUBMITTED AS EXHIBIT A AS ATTACHMENT 3-1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #3 ] (rolm) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV43540 Receipt No: ACACDC-32975588 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Schneider National Carriers, Inc., Maria Gurrola, Scott Howard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Defendant's Request for damages, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Statement of Damages) (Attorney Jaion Chung added to party Scott Howard(pty:dft))(Chung, Jaion) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) First CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Schneider National Carriers, Inc., (Attorney Jaion Chung added to party Schneider National Carriers, Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Chung, Jaion) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Chung, Jaion) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC. is a litigant