This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/26/2020 at 07:39:30 (UTC).

Schmitt v. Baker

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 Schmitt filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Baker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathaniel M. Gorton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10618

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathaniel M. Gorton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gabriel Schmitt

Sunderland, MA 01375

Defendant

Governor Charlie Baker

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER of USCA as to #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Gabriel Schmitt. On April 9, 2020, Appellant Gabriel Schmitt submitted an online payment to this court in the amount of $500.00. In a case appealing a decision of a district court, a filing fee in the amount of $505.00 should be paid directly to that district courts clerk. Appellants $500.00 payment to this court will be credited towards that fee but appellant is directed to pay the remaining $5.00 due to the Clerk of Court of the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, referencing district court case number 1:20-cv-10618-NMG (D. Mass). Failure to pay the remaining $5.00 to the district court by May 8, 2020 will result in the appeal being dismissed for lack of diligent prosecution. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

10 #2

Exhibit

10 #1

Cover Letter

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gabriel Schmitt. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit)(Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#9

(#9) Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #8 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #6 Order on Motion for TRO by Gabriel Schmitt NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 4/27/2020. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#6

(#6) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered denying #5 Motion for TRO (Lima, Christine) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#5

(#5) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Gabriel Schmitt.(Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gabriel Schmitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) USCA Appeal Fees received $ 5 receipt number 1BST079915 re #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Gabriel Schmitt. (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER of USCA as to #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Gabriel Schmitt. On April 9, 2020, Appellant Gabriel Schmitt submitted an online payment to this court in the amount of $500.00. In a case appealing a decision of a district court, a filing fee in the amount of $505.00 should be paid directly to that district courts clerk. Appellants $500.00 payment to this court will be credited towards that fee but appellant is directed to pay the remaining $5.00 due to the Clerk of Court of the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, referencing district court case number 1:20-cv-10618-NMG (D. Mass). Failure to pay the remaining $5.00 to the district court by May 8, 2020 will result in the appeal being dismissed for lack of diligent prosecution. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) USCA Case Number 20-1428 for #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Gabriel Schmitt. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gabriel Schmitt. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit)(Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #8 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #6 Order on Motion for TRO by Gabriel Schmitt NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 4/27/2020. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Copy re #6 Order on Motion for TRO mailed to Gabriel Schmitt on 3/31/20. (Lima, Christine) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered denying #5 Motion for TRO (Lima, Christine) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Gabriel Schmitt.(Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee/payment: $400.00, receipt number 1BST079392 for #1 Complaint (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gabriel Schmitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Governor Charlie Baker is a litigant