This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/01/2019 at 07:07:40 (UTC).

Schmitt et al v. USAA General Indemnity Company

Case Summary

On 08/02/2019 Schmitt filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against USAA General Indemnity Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy D. DeGiusti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00712

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy D. DeGiusti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Schmitt

Reba Schmitt

Defendant

USAA General Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron R Stiles

Attorney at Downtown Legal Group

114 W Main St

Norman, OK 73069

Austin A Meyer

Attorney at Downtown Legal Group

114 W Main St

Norman, OK 73069

Defendant Attorneys

Brandon L Buchanan

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Anna E Imose

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 10Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Austin A Meyer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Meyer, Austin) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Aaron R Stiles on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stiles, Aaron) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#5

(#5) DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 10/1/2019. (mb) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon L Buchanan on behalf of USAA General Indemnity Company (Buchanan, Brandon) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by USAA General Indemnity Company . (Imose, Anna) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Anna E Imose on behalf of USAA General Indemnity Company (Imose, Anna) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

1 #12

Exhibit 12 - 2019.7.24 - Letter to Dishman

1 #11

Exhibit 11 - 2019-07-23_Ltr to A Meyer & A Stiles

1 #10

Exhibit 10 - Corp Disclosure Statement

1 #9

Exhibit 9 - Account Record

1 #8

Exhibit 8 - Schmitt Voter Reg

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - Loss Event Overview Details

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Policy Excerpts

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - EOAs

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Answer of USAA GIC

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Service Packet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Austin A Meyer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Meyer, Austin) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Aaron R Stiles on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stiles, Aaron) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti. Status Report due by 10/1/2019. (mb) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Brandon L Buchanan on behalf of USAA General Indemnity Company (Buchanan, Brandon) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by USAA General Indemnity Company . (Imose, Anna) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Anna E Imose on behalf of USAA General Indemnity Company (Imose, Anna) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2970645. (Imose, Anna) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cleveland County, case number CJ-2019-781 filed by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Service Packet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Answer of USAA GIC, #5 Exhibit 5 - EOAs, #6 Exhibit 6 - Policy Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 7 - Loss Event Overview Details, #8 Exhibit 8 - Schmitt Voter Reg, #9 Exhibit 9 - Account Record, #10 Exhibit 10 - Corp Disclosure Statement, #11 Exhibit 11 - 2019-07-23_Ltr to A Meyer & A Stiles, #12 Exhibit 12 - 2019.7.24 - Letter to Dishman, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon L Buchanan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anna E Imose