This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2021 at 11:12:13 (UTC).

Schmidt v. Walmart Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 Schmidt filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jared C. Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00212

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jared C. Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vania Schmidt

Defendant

Walmart Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David S. Head

Attorney at HEAD LAW PLLC

111 E 5600 S Ste 100

Murray, UT 84107

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea M. Keysar

Attorney at MORGAN MINNOCK RICE & MINER

136 S Main Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Marianne Schumann

Attorney at MORGAN MINNOCK RICE & MINER

136 S Main Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Mitchel T. Rice

Attorney at MORGAN MINNOCK RICE & MINER

136 S Main Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

#7

#6

5 #18

Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification

5 #17

Notice of Removal

5 #16

Order granting 2nd Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process Return o

5 #15

Order granting 2nd Motion of Time for Service of Process

5 #12

2nd Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process

5 #11

Order Return of Electronic Notification

5 #10

Order granting Motion for Extension of Time for Serve Process

5 #9

Motion, Proposed Order and Request to Submit as to Motion for Extension of time

5 #8

Request to Submit Motion for Extension of Time

5 #7

Proposed Order re: Motion for Extension of Time

5 #2

Proposed Order Motion to Waive Fees (Motion not available for download)

5 #1

Complaint

#5

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket(#13) DOCKET TEXT ORDER TO COMPLY WITH DUCivR 81-2(c). The deadlines concerning scheduling set forth in DUCivR 81-2(c) have expired. The parties are ordered to comply with the scheduling requirements of DUCivR 81-2(c) within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 05/26/2021. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint filed by Walmart Inc..(Rice, Mitchel) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Vania Schmidt. (Head, David) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Plaintiff Vania Schmidt, Defendant Walmart Inc. (alf) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket(#9) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Vania Schmidt. (alf) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docket(#8) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Walmart Inc.. (alf) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Vania Schmidt, Defendant Walmart Inc.. Form due by 4/22/2021. (alf) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Vania Schmidt, Defendant Walmart Inc.. (mh) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) File downloaded from Third District Court, Salt Lake County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Proposed and Not Signed Orders regarding Waiving Fees( motion unavailable for download), Motion, Proposed Order, Request to Submit and Order granting extension of time for Service of Process, 2nd Motion, Proposed Order, Request to Submit and Order granting 2nd Motion for Extension of time for Service of Process, Notice of Removal and all applicable state court returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Motion to Waive Fees (Motion not available for download), #3 Complaint, Proposed Order re: Fees, Motion to Waive Fees (not available for download) Return of Electronic Notification, #4 Not signed Order to Waive Fees, #5 Not Signed Order to Waive Fees Return of Electronic Notification, #6 Motion to Extend Time for Service of Process, #7 Proposed Order re: Motion for Extension of Time, #8 Request to Submit Motion for Extension of Time, #9 Motion, Proposed Order and Request to Submit as to Motion for Extension of time Return of Electronic Notification, #10 Order granting Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process, #11 Order Return of Electronic Notification, #12 2nd Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process, #13 Proposed Order re: 2nd Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process, #14 Request to Submit 2nd Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process, #15 Order granting 2nd Motion of Time for Service of Process, #16 Order Return of Electronic Notification, #17 Notice of Removal, #18 Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification) (alf) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Rice, Mitchel) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Walmart Inc..(Rice, Mitchel) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 200902589, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3972096) filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Rice, Mitchel) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Defendant Walmart Inc. is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (mh) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant