This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/01/2022 at 09:46:55 (UTC).

Schmidt v. BWS Inspection Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 Schmidt filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against BWS Inspection Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Jeffrey C. Manske. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00910

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Jeffrey C. Manske

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Veronica Schmidt

Defendant

BWS Inspection Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A. Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Andrew W. Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap Law Firm

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Richard J. Burch

Attorney at Richard Burch

11 Greenway Plaza, Ste 3025

Houston, TX 77046

Taylor S. Montgomery

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap LLP

11 Greenway Plaza, Suite 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Defendant Attorneys

William Robinson Stukenberg

Attorney at Porter Hedges LLP

1000 Main St 36Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Jamie L. Houston

Attorney at Porter Hedges LLP

1000 Main St 36Th Flr, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - Consent

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Veronica Schmidt. (Josephson, Michael) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/6/2022) (sv). (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to BWS Inspection Services, LLC. (sv) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Veronica Schmidt (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taylor S. Montgomery on behalf of Veronica Schmidt (Montgomery, Taylor) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent of Joe Hampton by Veronica Schmidt (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Schmidt. BWS Inspection Services, LLC served on 9/27/2022, answer due 10/18/2022. (Montgomery, Taylor) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#8

(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney William Robinson Stukenberg added to party BWS Inspection Services, LLC(pty:dft) by BWS Inspection Services, LLC.(Stukenberg, William) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

#9

(#9) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BWS Inspection Services, LLC. (Stukenberg, William) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BWS Inspection Services, LLC. (Stukenberg, William) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney William Robinson Stukenberg added to party BWS Inspection Services, LLC(pty:dft) by BWS Inspection Services, LLC.(Stukenberg, William) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Schmidt. BWS Inspection Services, LLC served on 9/27/2022, answer due 10/18/2022. (Montgomery, Taylor) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent of Joe Hampton by Veronica Schmidt (Josephson, Michael) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taylor S. Montgomery on behalf of Veronica Schmidt (Montgomery, Taylor) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Veronica Schmidt (Dunlap, Andrew) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (sv) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to BWS Inspection Services, LLC. (sv) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Veronica Schmidt. (Josephson, Michael) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/6/2022) (sv). (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16484098), filed by Veronica Schmidt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/6/2022) (sv). (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jamie Lynn Houston

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William R Stukenberg