This case was last updated from PACER on 07/03/2020 at 08:57:22 (UTC).

SCHMID et al v. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 SCHMID filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony P. Patti, Mark A. Goldsmith, Judith E. Levy and R. Steven Whalen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-11090

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Anthony P. Patti

R. Steven Whalen

Presiding Judges

Mark A. Goldsmith

Judith E. Levy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAMELA ANDERSON

DANIEL MCGORREY

SHERRI MCCALL

MICHELLE SCHMID

JOSHUA CAPLES

LUIS MUNOZ

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth R. Chadwell

Attorney at Mantese Honigman P.C.

1361E. Big Beaver Road

Troy, MI 48083

Trisha K. Monesi

Attorney at Capstone Law APC

1875 Century Park East., Ste 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Cody R. Padgett

Attorney at Capstone Law, APC

1875 Century Park East, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Steven R. Weinmann

Attorney at Capstone Law APC

1875 Century Park East, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Tarek H. Zohdy

Attorney at Capstone Law, APC

1875 Century Park East, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Douglas Toering

Attorney at Mantese Honigman, P.C.

1361 E. Big Beaver Road

Troy, MI 48083

Timothy N Mathews

Attorney at Chimicles Schwartz Kriner & Donaldson-Smith LLP

361 W. Lancaster Avenue

Haverford, PA 19041

Ryan Hansen

Attorney at Mantese Honigman, PC

1361 E Big Beaver Rd

Troy, MI 48083

Russell D. Paul

Attorney at Berger Montague PC

1818 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Amey J. Park

Attorney at Berger Montague PC

1818 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Abigail Gertner

Attorney at Berger Montague PC

1818 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Alex Kashurba

Attorney at Chimicles Schwartz Kriner & Donaldson-Smith LLP

361 W. Lancaster Avenue

Haverford, PA 19041

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick G. Seyferth

Attorney at Bush, Seyferth & Paige

100 W. Big Beaver Road, Suite 400

Troy, MI 48084-3107

Stephen A. D'Aunoy

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

One Us Bank Plaza

Saint Louis, MO 63101

Kathy A. Wisniewski

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

One Us Bank Plaza, 26Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63101

Brandi L. Burke

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

One U.S. Bank Plaza

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#16

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to #1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 8/10/2020, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE by FCA US LLC of withdrawal of #16 MOTION for Order Consent Motion and Brief in Support for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint and for Additional Pages . (Burke, Brandi) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ryan Hansen appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs and the Proposed Putative Class Members (Hansen, Ryan) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti in Detroit to District Judge Judith E. Levy and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen in Ann Arbor. (NAhm) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Kashurba on behalf of PAMELA ANDERSON, JOSHUA CAPLES, SHERRI MCCALL, DANIEL MCGORREY, LUIS MUNOZ, MICHELLE SCHMID. (Kashurba, Alex) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy N Mathews on behalf of PAMELA ANDERSON, JOSHUA CAPLES, SHERRI MCCALL, DANIEL MCGORREY, LUIS MUNOZ, MICHELLE SCHMID. (Mathews, Timothy) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent FCA North America Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V., Other Affiliate FCA Holdco B.V. for FCA US LLC. (D'Aunoy, Stephen) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen A. D'Aunoy appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (D'Aunoy, Stephen) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kathy A. Wisniewski appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Wisniewski, Kathy) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brandi L. Burke appearing on behalf of FCA US LLC (Burke, Brandi) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Russell D. Paul on behalf of PAMELA ANDERSON, JOSHUA CAPLES, SHERRI MCCALL, DANIEL MCGORREY, LUIS MUNOZ, MICHELLE SCHMID. (Paul, Russell) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Abigail Gertner appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gertner, Abigail) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Amey J. Park on behalf of PAMELA ANDERSON, JOSHUA CAPLES, SHERRI MCCALL, DANIEL MCGORREY, LUIS MUNOZ, MICHELLE SCHMID. (Park, Amey) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tarek H. Zohdy appearing on behalf of PAMELA ANDERSON, JOSHUA CAPLES, SHERRI MCCALL, DANIEL MCGORREY, LUIS MUNOZ, MICHELLE SCHMID (Zohdy, Tarek) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Cody R. Padgett appearing on behalf of PAMELA ANDERSON, JOSHUA CAPLES, SHERRI MCCALL, DANIEL MCGORREY, LUIS MUNOZ, MICHELLE SCHMID (Padgett, Cody) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Steven R. Weinmann appearing on behalf of PAMELA ANDERSON, JOSHUA CAPLES, SHERRI MCCALL, DANIEL MCGORREY, LUIS MUNOZ, MICHELLE SCHMID (Weinmann, Steven) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Douglas Toering appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Toering, Douglas) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *FCA US LLC* (DAll) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: BMIEDC-7781303 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland County. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United State District Court Eastern District, 20-11040, Judge Judith E. Levy] (Chadwell, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick G. Seyferth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandi L. Burke

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathy A. Wisniewski