This case was last updated from PACER on 08/08/2020 at 10:30:14 (UTC).

Schmardebeck v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 Schmardebeck filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cam Ferenbach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01022

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cam Ferenbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LaDawn M. Schmardebeck

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hal Taylor

223 Marsh Avenue

Reno, NV 89509

Defendant Attorney

Carolyn Beth Chen

Attorney at Social Security Administration

160 Spear St., Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint and issue summons to the United States Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/16/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Carolyn Beth Chen on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Chen, Carolyn) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. Commissioner of Social Security served on 6/30/2020. (JM) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT as to Atty General re #7 Certified Mail Receipt. (JM) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT as to SSA re #7 Certified Mail Receipt. (JM) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS (2346 - SSA; 2339 - Atty General) re #5 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued as to USA. (JM) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JM - cc: USM) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by LaDawn M. Schmardebeck. Proof of service due by 9/14/2020. (JM) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint and issue summons to the United States Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/16/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (SLD) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (SLD) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by LaDawn M. Schmardebeck. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff LaDawn M. Schmardebeck. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #4 Summons AG, #5 Summons OGC, #6 Summons USAC) CONSENT to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. In accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. section 636(c), I voluntarily consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all further proceedings in this case, including entry of final judgment. I understand that appeal from the judgment shall be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (Taylor, Hal) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less