This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2020 at 07:59:14 (UTC).

Schlis et al v. Target Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 Schlis filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01201

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nancy Schlis

Simeon Schlis

Defendant

Target Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

R. Peter Taylor

Attorney at Hoefle Phoenix Gormley & Roberts PA

127 Parrott Ave, Po Box 4480

Portsmouth, NH 03802-4480

Defendant Attorney

Meredith M. Lasna

Attorney at Morrison Mahoney LLP

1001 Elm St, Ste 305

Manchester, NH 03101

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Notice of Lawsuit

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $400, receipt number ANHDC-1900936 filed by Nancy Schlis, Simeon Schlis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Lawsuit, #3 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Taylor, R.) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Target Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (mc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2019: #1 Notice ECF) (mc). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #1

Notice ECF

#5

(#5) Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order filed by Nancy Schlis, Simeon Schlis. (Taylor, R.) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case with jury demand filed by Target Corporation.(Lasna, Meredith) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Lasna, Meredith) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

1 #3

Waiver of the Service of Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order filed by Nancy Schlis, Simeon Schlis. (Taylor, R.) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 2/4/2020. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Lasna, Meredith) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case with jury demand filed by Target Corporation.(Lasna, Meredith) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Target Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (mc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2019: #1 Notice ECF) (mc). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1201-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $400, receipt number ANHDC-1900936 filed by Nancy Schlis, Simeon Schlis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Lawsuit, #3 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Taylor, R.) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.