This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/03/2020 at 09:22:20 (UTC).

Schleve v. BNSF Railway Company

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 Schleve filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against BNSF Railway Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Clare R. Hochhalter and Daniel M. Traynor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00166

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Clare R. Hochhalter

Presiding Judge

Daniel M. Traynor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tanner C. Schleve

Defendant

BNSF Railway Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan L Stone

Attorney at The Moody Law Firm, Inc.

500 Crawford Street, Suite 200

Portsmouth, VA 23704

Nicholas Thompson

Attorney at The Moody Law Firm, Inc.

500 Crawford Street, Suite 200

Portsmouth, VA 23705

Defendant Attorneys

Roland John Wells, III

Attorney at HKM

30 E. 7Th Street, Suite 3200

St. Paul, MN 55101

Andrew D. Cook

Attorney at Ohnstad Twichell

901 13Th Ave. E., P.O. Box 458

West Fargo, ND 58078-0458

Daniel A. Haws

Attorney at HKM

30 E. 7Th Street, Suite 3200

St. Paul, MN 55101

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2020 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (JS) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BNSF Railway Company.(Cook, Andrew) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Company. (rh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BNSF Railway Company (Filing fee $400, receipt number 120001025) filed by Tanner C. Schleve. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh) Modified on 9/8/2020 (rh) to add receipt number. (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BNSF Railway Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Thompson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Lewis Stone