This case was last updated from PACER on 11/06/2020 at 07:39:35 (UTC).

Schinsing v. Morgan et al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2020 Schinsing filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Morgan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Klindt and Timothy J. Corrigan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01007

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James R. Klindt

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Corrigan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Donald E Schinsing, Jr.

Donald E. Schinsing, Jr.

Defendants

John R Patteson

Mary Morgan

John R. Patteson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Springer

Attorney at Robert H. Springer, PA

3003 S. Congress Ave., Suite 1A

Palm Springs, FL 33461

Defendant Attorneys

Sean Patrick Walsh

Attorney at McGuireWoods, LLP

Suite 3300, 50 N Laura St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Robert Eric Bilik

Attorney at McGuireWoods, LLP

Suite 3300, 50 N Laura St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Conduct Case Management Conference and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Defendants shall have up to and including 11/13/2020 to respond to the Complaint for Declaratory Relief. The parties shall have up to and including 11/20/2020 to conduct the case management conference and file the case management report.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 10/8/2020. (MDC) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint and Case Management Report by All Defendants. (Walsh, Sean) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

7 #2

Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form

7 #1

Case Management Report form

#7

(#7) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; Defendants shall have up to and including 10/14/2020 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 9/9/2020. (BHC) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Complaint by All Defendants. (Walsh, Sean) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. (Entered: 09/08/2020)

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT, originally filed in the Seventh Judicial Circuit, St. Johns County, on 7/29/2020, case number CA20-0806 against Mary Morgan, John R. Patteson filed by Donald E. Schinsing, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KKH) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

State Court Other Documents State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #2

State Court Docket Sheet State Court Record

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Seventh Judicial Circuit in and for St. Johns County, Florida, case number 20-CA-0806 filed in State Court on 07/29/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17276988 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Record, #3 State Court Other Documents State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walsh, Sean) (Entered: 09/07/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and to Conduct Case Management Conference and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Defendants shall have up to and including 11/13/2020 to respond to the Complaint for Declaratory Relief. The parties shall have up to and including 11/20/2020 to conduct the case management conference and file the case management report.. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 10/8/2020. (MDC) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint and Case Management Report by All Defendants. (Walsh, Sean) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report form, #2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; Defendants shall have up to and including 10/14/2020 to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 9/9/2020. (BHC) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 Complaint by All Defendants. (Walsh, Sean) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to counsel Robert H. Springer of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KKH) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:20-cv-1007-J-32JRK. (SJB) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT, originally filed in the Seventh Judicial Circuit, St. Johns County, on 7/29/2020, case number CA20-0806 against Mary Morgan, John R. Patteson filed by Donald E. Schinsing, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KKH) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Seventh Judicial Circuit in and for St. Johns County, Florida, case number 20-CA-0806 filed in State Court on 07/29/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17276988 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Record, #3 State Court Other Documents State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walsh, Sean) (Entered: 09/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less