This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2021 at 09:20:09 (UTC).

Schindler v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Schindler filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01232

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Schindler

Defendants

Dignity Health Welfare Benefits Plan

Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brent Dorian Brehm

Attorney at Kantor & Kantor

19839 Nordhoff Street, #1B

Northridge, CA 91324

Corinne Chandler

Attorney at Kantor & Kantor, LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Defendant Attorneys

Charan M. Higbee

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

1 Kaiser Plaza, Suite 340

Oakland, CA 94612

Wendy Lynn Furman

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington, LLP

2385 Executive Center Drive, Suite 400

Boca Raton, FL 33431

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #15 Wendy L. Furman's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#15

(#15) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Wendy L. Furman ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15811904.) filed by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Furman, Wendy) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#14

(#14) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston.. (Higbee, Charan) (Filed on 3/30/2021) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#13

(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT LINCOLN LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/30/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#12

(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation, Other Affiliate The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, an Indiana insurance company for Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Higbee, Charan) (Filed on 3/15/2021) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION to Extend Time For Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint, filed by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston and Susan Schindler. (Higbee, Charan) (Filed on 3/15/2021) Modified on 3/16/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Schindler. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Brehm, Brent) (Filed on 3/10/2021) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Susan Schindler.. (Brehm, Brent) (Filed on 3/8/2021) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#8

(#8) AMENDED Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Dignity Health Welfare Benefits Plan, Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#4

(#4) Civil Cover Sheet by Susan Schindler Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (Brehm, Brent) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Susan Schindler re #1 Complaint, (Brehm, Brent) (Filed on 2/19/2021) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Brehm, Brent) (Filed on 2/19/2021) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Dignity Health Welfare Benefits Plan, Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15598727.). Filed bySusan Schindler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brehm, Brent) (Filed on 2/19/2021) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #15 Wendy L. Furman's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Wendy L. Furman ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15811904.) filed by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Furman, Wendy) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston.. (Higbee, Charan) (Filed on 3/30/2021) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT LINCOLN LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/30/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation, Other Affiliate The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, an Indiana insurance company for Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Higbee, Charan) (Filed on 3/15/2021) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION to Extend Time For Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint, filed by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston and Susan Schindler. (Higbee, Charan) (Filed on 3/15/2021) Modified on 3/16/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Schindler. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Brehm, Brent) (Filed on 3/10/2021) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Susan Schindler.. (Brehm, Brent) (Filed on 3/8/2021) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Dignity Health Welfare Benefits Plan, Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/8/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Cover Sheet by Susan Schindler Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (Brehm, Brent) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used [err201]. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20). Please complete correct Civil Cover Shee t and e-file an an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Susan Schindler (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Susan Schindler re #1 Complaint, (Brehm, Brent) (Filed on 2/19/2021) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Brehm, Brent) (Filed on 2/19/2021) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Dignity Health Welfare Benefits Plan, Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15598727.). Filed bySusan Schindler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brehm, Brent) (Filed on 2/19/2021) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charan M Higbee

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wendy Lynn Furman