This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/25/2021 at 14:04:46 (UTC).

Rubin v. Schindler Elevator Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 Rubin filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Schindler Elevator Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jorge L. Alonso and Jeffrey T. Gilbert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04036

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

Referral Judge

Jeffrey T. Gilbert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alvin Rubin

Defendants

Schindler Elevator Corporation

20 Whippany Road

Morristown, NJ 07960

Loews Chicago Operating Company, LLC doing business as Loews Chicago Hotel

EKLUND'S INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lauren Deena Cohen

Attorney at Donald A. Shapiro Ltd.

180 North Lasalle Street, Suite 3050

Chicago, IL 60601

Matthew R. Basinger

Attorney at Donald A. Shapiro, Ltd

180 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorneys

Alan Max Bernover

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo

303 West Madison Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606

Brian Hoppe

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo

303 W Madison Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606

David Jonathon Olmstead

Attorney at Law Offices of Meachum & Starck

225 W. Washington, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#56

#55

#54

47 #2

Text of Proposed Order

47 #1

Notice of Filing

#47

45 #2

Notice of Filing NOM

45 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#45

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant EKLUND'S INC. (crl, ) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendant Loews Hotels Holding Corporation's motion for leave to file #45 is granted. Defendant Loews Hotels Holding Corporaation's is granted leave to file its Third Party Complaint against Third Party Defendant, Eklund, Inc. The third party complaint must be filed as a separate docket entry. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file second amended complaint at law #47 is granted. The amended complaint must be filed as a separate docket entry. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED complaint by Alvin Rubin against Loews Hotels Holding Corporation, Schindler Elevator Corporation, EKLUND'S INC. (Cohen, Lauren) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Telephonic motion hearing set for 3/18/21 at 9:30 a.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 888-808-6929 and the access code is 4911854. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: The parties' Agreed Motion to Modify Discovery Deadlines #51 is granted. The discovery schedule set in the Court's order of 10/30/20 #33 is stricken. The fact discovery deadline is extended to 6/9/21. The parties shall file an updated status report by 4/30/21. The motion hearing noticed for 3/18/21 is stricken. Mailed notice (ber, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Agreed Motion to Modify Discovery Deadlines NOTICE of Motion by Alan Max Bernover for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #51 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/18/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Bernover, Alan) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MOTION by Defendant Schindler Elevator Corporation (AGREED) to Modify Discovery Deadlines (Bernover, Alan) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE of Motion by David Jonathon Olmstead for presentment of motion to amend/correct #47 , motion for leave to file #45 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/18/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Olmstead, David) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) NOTIC EOF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT NOTICE of Motion by Lauren Deena Cohen for presentment of motion to amend/correct #47 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/18/2021 at 09:30 AM. (Cohen, Lauren) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: The motion hearing noticed for 3/18/21 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Gilbert #46 is stricken. The parties are directed to comply with Judge Alonso's published procedures for presenting motions to him. Mailed notice (ber, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Loews Hotels Holding Corporation(Olmstead, David) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Loews Hotels Holding Corporation by David Jonathon Olmstead (Olmstead, David) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE by Plaintiff Alvin Rubin ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE (Cohen, Lauren) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alvin Rubin by Lauren Deena Cohen (Cohen, Lauren) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (sxb, ) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, ) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) EXHIBIT by Defendant Schindler Elevator Corporation Exhibit B to Notice of Removal regarding notice of removal #2 (Bernover, Alan) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EXHIBIT by Defendant Schindler Elevator Corporation Exhibit A to Notice of Removal regarding notice of removal #2 (Bernover, Alan) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Cook County, case number (2020 L 005840) filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation (Bernover, Alan) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bernover, Alan) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schindler Elevator Corporation is a litigant