This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2021 at 07:06:04 (UTC).

Schiltz et al v. Radius Global Solutions, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 Schiltz filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Radius Global Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie L White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-02403

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie L White

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kathleen Schiltz

Earl Schiltz

Defendants

Radius Global Solutions, LLC

Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter F Barry

Attorney at The Barry Law Office, Ltd

333 Washington Ave Nosuite 300 #9038

Minneapolis, MN 55401-1353

Defendant Attorneys

Samantha R. Alsadi

Attorney at Erstad & Riemer, P.A.

7301 Ohms Lane, Suite 400

Minneapolis, MN 55439

Thomas H Schaefer

Attorney at Erstad & Riemer, P.A.

7301 Ohms Lane, Suite 400

Minneapolis, MN 55439

Joshua L Johanningmeier

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn

1 E Main St Ste 500

Madison, WI 53703

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Johanningmeier, Joshua) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.. (Johanningmeier, Joshua) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Radius Global Solutions, LLC. (Schaefer, Thomas) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Radius Global Solutions, LLC. (Schaefer, Thomas) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER on #11 Stipulation. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. answer due 12/10/2021. Signed by Judge Ronnie L White on 11/18/2021.(kt) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER on #14 Stipulation. Radius Global Solutions, LLC answer due 12/10/2021. Signed by Judge Ronnie L White on 11/18/2021.(kt) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Stipulation. (Schaefer, Thomas) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by Radius Global Solutions, LLC. Jointly Signed by Kathleen Schiltz and Earl Schiltz. (Schaefer, Thomas) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas H Schaefer on behalf of Radius Global Solutions, LLC. (Schaefer, Thomas) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 Stipulation. (Johanningmeier, Joshua) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: DESIGNATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE FOR SERVICE IN ANOTHER DISTRICT WITHIN CIRCUIT. Case reassigned to Judge Ronnie L White for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 21cv2403 RLW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Lavenski R. Smith, United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit on 11/3/2021(JME) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathleen Schiltz, Earl Schiltz. Radius Global Solutions, LLC served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. (Barry, Peter) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathleen Schiltz, Earl Schiltz. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. (Barry, Peter) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kathleen Schiltz, Earl Schiltz as to Radius Global Solutions, LLC. (Barry, Peter) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz are no longer assigned to this case. NOTE: The new case number is 21-cv-2403. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (lmb) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. It is hereby determined that all U.S. District Judges and U.S. Magistrate Judges of the Court are disqualified from presiding over this matter. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 10/29/2021. (lmb) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docket(#4) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Radius Global Solutions, LLC. (CLK) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docket(#2) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 21-cv-2403 WMW/DTS. (CLK) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Radius Global Solutions, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9112816) filed by Kathleen Schiltz, Earl Schiltz. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Kohl's Credit Card Agreement, #2 Exhibit(s) Kohl's Consent Decree with FTC, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barry, Peter) Modified text on 10/29/2021 (KNK). (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Radius Global Solutions LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES INC. DBA DBA: A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AKA KOHL'S INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA KOHL'S SEAL BEACH STORE 10604 DBA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS A PUBLIC ENTITY UNDER LAWS OF AND IN T is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samantha R. Alsadi

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua L Johanningmeier