This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:23:34 (UTC).

Schiller v. TPI Iowa, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 Schiller filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against TPI Iowa, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen B. Jackson, Jr and Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00084

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen B. Jackson, Jr

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ranee Schiller

Defendants

TPI Iowa, LLC

TPI Iowa LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Rachelle Beck

Attorney at FIEDLER LAW FIRM PLC

8831 Windsor Parkway

Johnston, IA 50131

Madison Elizabeth Fiedler-Carlson

Attorney at FIEDLER LAW FIRM PLC

8831 Windsor Parkway

Johnston, IA 50131

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca Elizabeth Reif

Attorney at AHLERS & COONEY

100 Court Avenue, Suite 600

Des Moines, IA 50309

Emily Kolbe

Attorney at AHLERS & COONEY

100 Court Avenue, Suite 600

Des Moines, IA 50309

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

LR81A List on Removal

#2

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Joint Proposed Protective Order

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/10/2019. (jeb) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Jury Trial set to begin 9/14/2020 9:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse - Room 160 - before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger for estimated 5 days. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2020 9:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse - Room 160 - before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Initial Disclosures due by 6/14/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 9/9/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/9/2019. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 10/11/2019. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures due by 11/11/2019. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosures due by 12/11/2019. Discovery Deadline 1/17/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 2/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/10/2019. (jeb) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/9/2019. Attorneys Amy Beck & Madison Fiedler-Carlson appeared for plaintiff. Attorneys Emily Kolbe & Rebecca Reif appeared for defendant. Scheduling order to be entered. Total Court Time: 15 minutes. (jeb) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (jeb) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) TEXT ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion for Protective Order. The court approves and will enter the proposed protective order submitted with the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (jeb) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Ranee Schiller.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Joint Proposed Protective Order)(Beck, Amy) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Beck, Amy) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference shall be held on May 9, 2019, at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by May 6, 2019. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 4/30/2019. (jeb) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by TPI Iowa LLC. (Reif, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by TPI Iowa LLC.(Reif, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 4/10/2019. (slg) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Errata CORRECTED re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by TPI Iowa, LLC. (Kolbe, Emily) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TPI IOWA, LLC from Jasper, case number LCV121425. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3769057., filed by TPI IOWA, LLC. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 6/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 LR81A List on Removal)(Kolbe, Emily) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily A. Kolbe

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Elizabeth Reif(Designation Retained)