This case was last updated from PACER on 08/22/2021 at 07:26:47 (UTC).

Michael Schiffman v. The Standard Fire Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Michael Schiffman filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Standard Fire Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Percy Anderson and Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05109

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Schiffman

Defendants

Randy Khan

The Standard Fire Insurance Company

The Travelers Companies, Inc.

Does 1 through 25, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ian I Herzog

Attorney at Herzog Yuhas Ehrlich and Ardell LLC

11400 West Olympic Suite 1150

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant Attorneys

David S Song

Attorney at Weston and McElvain LLP

1960 East Grand Avenue Suite 400

El Segundo, CA 90245

Aaron C Agness

Attorney at Weston and McElvain LLP

1960 East Grand Avenue Suite 400

El Segundo, CA 90245

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Receipt of Acknowledgment of documents by Los Angeles County Superior Court, case no. 21STCV11873. (lom) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#9

(#9) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. For the reasons stated above, Removing Defendant has failed to establish that the Court possesses diversity jurisdiction over this action. Accordingly, the Court remands this action to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 21STCV11873, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). (See document for details) Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (lh) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Standard Fire Insurance Company, identifying The Travelers Companies, Inc. (listed as Defendant, not yet served). (Song, David) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Song, David) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of David S. Song re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Song, David) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Song, David) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Receipt of Acknowledgment of documents by Los Angeles County Superior Court, case no. 21STCV11873. (lom) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. For the reasons stated above, Removing Defendant has failed to establish that the Court possesses diversity jurisdiction over this action. Accordingly, the Court remands this action to Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 21STCV11873, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). (See document for details) Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (lh) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Randy Khan, The Standard Fire Insurance Company, The Travelers Companies, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Michael Schiffman. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/26/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Standard Fire Insurance Company, identifying The Travelers Companies, Inc. (listed as Defendant, not yet served). (Song, David) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Song, David) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of David S. Song re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Song, David) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Song, David) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV11873 Receipt No: ACACDC-31513997 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court - Summons, #2 State Court - Complaint, #3 State Court - Notice of Case Assignment, #4 State Court - Notice of Posting Jury Fees, #5 State Court - Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulations Packet, #6 State Court - ADR Information Package, #7 State Court - First Amended General Order) (Attorney David S Song added to party The Standard Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Song, David) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Travelers is a litigant

Latest cases where Standard Fire Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron Chapman Agness

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David S Song