This case was last updated from PACER on 08/21/2021 at 09:10:21 (UTC).

Schied v. U-Haul International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 Schied filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against U-Haul International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey L. Viken and Lawrence L. Piersol. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-05035

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jeffrey L. Viken

Lawrence L. Piersol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Schied

Spearfish, SD 57783

Defendants

Does #1-20

U-Haul International, Inc.

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SCREENING ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 08/02/2021. (SAC) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#14

(#14) TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re #12 Notice of Appeal. (SAC) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 08/19/2021. (SAC) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

12 #1

Proof of Service

#11

(#11) JUDGMENT Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 08/02/2021. (SAC) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol for all further proceedings. U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 07/27/2021. (SAC) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#7

(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE by David Schied (SAC) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#6

(#6) REGISTRATION for Electronic Notice by David Schied. Pro se party David Schied will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (SAC) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#5

(#5) BENFICIARY'S MOTION FOR INDIGENT AND DISABLED FILER TO AVOID EXPENSIVE COPY AND MAIL COSTS BY WAIVER AS A CM/ECF "E-FILER" by David Schied. (SAC) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

4 #1

USM-285 Form

#4

(#4) BENEFICIARY'S MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA AND COMPLAINT BY U.S. MARSHAL WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by David Schied. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Form) (SAC) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#3

(#3) BENEFICIARY'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS; WITH ACCOMPANYING COMPLETED "APPLICATION" FOR THE SAME by David Schied. (SAC) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Short Form) by David Schied. (SAC) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

1 #1

Cover Letter with Bill for Costs

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter with Bill for Costs) (SAC) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re #12 Notice of Appeal. (SAC) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 08/19/2021. (SAC) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #11 Judgment by David Schied. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Cover Letter). (SAC) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JUDGMENT Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 08/02/2021. (SAC) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SCREENING ORDER FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 08/02/2021. (SAC) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol for all further proceedings. U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 07/27/2021. (SAC) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with an Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs. A new case has been opened. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed of the plaintiff's address changes, including changes to primary and secondary email addresses. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (SAC) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE by David Schied (SAC) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REGISTRATION for Electronic Notice by David Schied. Pro se party David Schied will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (SAC) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BENFICIARY'S MOTION FOR INDIGENT AND DISABLED FILER TO AVOID EXPENSIVE COPY AND MAIL COSTS BY WAIVER AS A CM/ECF "E-FILER" by David Schied. (SAC) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BENEFICIARY'S MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA AND COMPLAINT BY U.S. MARSHAL WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by David Schied. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Form) (SAC) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BENEFICIARY'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS; WITH ACCOMPANYING COMPLETED "APPLICATION" FOR THE SAME by David Schied. (SAC) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Short Form) by David Schied. (SAC) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter with Bill for Costs) (SAC) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U-HAUL INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant