This case was last updated from PACER on 06/10/2020 at 12:27:09 (UTC).

Scherer v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2020 Scherer filed an Other lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Hittner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01295

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Hittner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Edward L. Scherer

Donald Kowall

Defendant

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Salar Ali Ahmed

430 W. Bell St

Houston, TX 77019

Defendant Attorneys

Charles Bedford Hampton

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

600 Travis, Ste 7500

Houston, TX 77002

Sverker Hogberg

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

1870 Embarcadero Road

Palo Alto, CA 94303-3308

Christopher Michael Viapiano

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

1700 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006-5215

Nicolas Bourtin

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Wells Fargo & Co. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Hampton, Charles) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

29 #1

Proposed Order

#29

(#29) MOTION to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., #25 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hampton, Charles) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

25 #2

Exhibit - B

25 #1

Exhibit - A

#25

(#25) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filed by Edward L. Scherer, Donald Kowall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A, #2 Exhibit - B)(Ahmed, Salar) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order( Motion Docket Date 5/13/2020.), MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Donald Kowall, Edward L. Scherer, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A, #2 Exhibit - B, #3 Exhibit - C, #4 Exhibit - D, #5 Exhibit - E, #6 Exhibit - F, #7 Exhibit - G, #8 Proposed Order)(Ahmed, Salar) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

8 #2

Exhibit - B

8 #1

Exhibit - A

#8

(#23) MOTION to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hampton, Charles) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER that the Original Class Action Complaint and Motion for Injunctive Relief is denied without prejudice as to the request for a preliminary injunction. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

#6

(#6) Additional EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Edward L. Scherer, filed.(Ahmed, Salar) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed.(Ahmed, Salar) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Edward L. Scherer, filed.(Ahmed, Salar) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit - A

#1

(#6) Additional EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Edward L. Scherer, filed.(Ahmed, Salar) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Wells Fargo & Co. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Hampton, Charles) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., #25 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hampton, Charles) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Motion hearing held denying #21 MOTION to Expedite Written Discovery. Appearances: Salar Ali Ahmed, Charles Bedford Hampton, Christopher Michael Viapiano, Nicolas Bourtin. Ct Reporter: K. Metzger. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER denying as moot #23 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) RESPONSE in Opposition to #21 MOTION to Expedite Written Discovery, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Hampton, Charles) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filed by Edward L. Scherer, Donald Kowall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A, #2 Exhibit - B)(Ahmed, Salar) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Setting as to #21 MOTION to Expedite Written Discovery. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2020 at 03:00 PM in by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray, filed. (jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Dismiss #8 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hampton, Charles) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray re #21 MOTION to Expedite Written Discovery, filed. (ealexander, 4) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Expedite Written Discovery by Donald Kowall, Edward L. Scherer, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A, #2 Proposed Order)(Ahmed, Salar) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Donald Kowall, Edward L. Scherer, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ahmed, Salar) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order( Motion Docket Date 5/13/2020.), MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Donald Kowall, Edward L. Scherer, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A, #2 Exhibit - B, #3 Exhibit - C, #4 Exhibit - D, #5 Exhibit - E, #6 Exhibit - F, #7 Exhibit - G, #8 Proposed Order)(Ahmed, Salar) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filed by Edward L. Scherer, Donald Kowall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A, #2 Exhibit - B)(Ahmed, Salar) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER that the Original Class Action Complaint and Motion for Injunctive Relief is denied without prejudice as to the request for a preliminary injunction. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Additional EXHIBITS re: #1 Complaint by Edward L. Scherer, filed.(Ahmed, Salar) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed.(Ahmed, Salar) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Edward L. Scherer, filed.(Ahmed, Salar) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24538455) filed by Edward L. Scherer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A)(Ahmed, Salar) (Entered: 04/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant