This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/21/2022 at 11:21:38 (UTC).

Scherer v. Schneider National Carriers, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2022 Scherer filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Schneider National Carriers, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew James Maddox. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02116

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew James Maddox

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amelia M Scherer

Defendants

Schneider National Carriers, Inc.

Latoya M Leach

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas Johns Whiteford

Attorney at Whiteford Taylor and Preston LLP

Seven Saint Paul St Ste 1500

Baltimore, MD 21202-1636

Defendant Attorney

Inga Oesterle Upshaw

Attorney at Ryan, Drewniak & Upshaw, PA

31 Old Solomons Island Rd Ste 201

Annapolis, MD 21401

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) ORDER re Informal Discovery Dispute Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox on 10/18/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#24

(#24) ORDER re #17 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox on 10/18/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#22

(#22) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Upshaw, Inga) Modified on 10/6/2022 (bas, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 10/11/2022 (bas, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#21

(#21) ORDER Rescheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 9/30/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#20

(#20) ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 9/29/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

#18

(#18) ORDER Directing the Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #17 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/27/2022. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

#17

(#17) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox for All Further Proceedings and Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for ADR Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/27/2022. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

#16

(#16) Marginal ORDER APPROVING #15 Status Report filed by Latoya M Leach, Schneider National Carriers, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/26/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

#15

(#15) STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report to the Honorable Richard D. Bennett by Latoya M Leach, Schneider National Carriers, Inc.(Upshaw, Inga) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

#9

(#9) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Latoya M Leach, Schneider National Carriers, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Schneider National, Inc., Corporate Parent INS Insurance, Inc. for Latoya M Leach, Schneider National Carriers, Inc..(Upshaw, Inga) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#7

(#7) Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued 30 days as to Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT against Latoya M Leach, Schneider National Carriers, Inc., filed by Amelia M Scherer. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#4

(#8) QC NOTICE: #4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Latoya M Leach, Schneider National Carriers, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Any entity listed on the Corporate Disclosure should be entered as a corporate parent/other affiliate when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Latoya M Leach, Schneider National Carriers, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, State Court Writs of Summonses (Upshaw, Inga) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Latoya M Leach, Schneider National Carriers, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, State Court Complaint and Prayer for Jury Trial (Upshaw, Inga) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER re Informal Discovery Dispute Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox on 10/18/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER re #17 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox on 10/18/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Upshaw, Inga) Modified on 10/6/2022 (bas, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 10/11/2022 (bas, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER Rescheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 9/30/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 9/29/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER Directing the Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #17 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/27/2022. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Matthew James Maddox for All Further Proceedings and Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for ADR Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/27/2022. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Marginal ORDER APPROVING #15 Status Report filed by Latoya M Leach, Schneider National Carriers, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/26/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report to the Honorable Richard D. Bennett by Latoya M Leach, Schneider National Carriers, Inc.(Upshaw, Inga) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER re Informal Discovery Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/13/2022. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Latoya M Leach, Schneider National Carriers, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Schneider National, Inc., Corporate Parent INS Insurance, Inc. for Latoya M Leach, Schneider National Carriers, Inc..(Upshaw, Inga) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) QC NOTICE: #4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Latoya M Leach, Schneider National Carriers, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Any entity listed on the Corporate Disclosure should be entered as a corporate parent/other affiliate when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (5-6) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued 30 days as to Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against Latoya M Leach, Schneider National Carriers, Inc., filed by Amelia M Scherer. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) -FILED IN ERROR- Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Latoya M Leach, Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Upshaw, Inga) Modified on 8/23/2022 (ols, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Latoya M Leach, Schneider National Carriers, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, State Court Writs of Summonses (Upshaw, Inga) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Latoya M Leach, Schneider National Carriers, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, State Court Complaint and Prayer for Jury Trial (Upshaw, Inga) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, Maryland, case number C-03-CV-22-002690. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10112973), filed by Latoya M Leach, Schneider National Carriers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Upshaw, Inga) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Inga Oesterle Upshaw