This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/11/2020 at 08:11:36 (UTC).

Scher v. Round Hill Music LP et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 Scher filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Round Hill Music LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis J. Liman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01208

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis J. Liman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Scher

Defendants

Round Hill Music LP

Joshua Gruss

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amy Faith Shulman

Attorney at Outten & Golden, LLP (NYC)

685 Third Avenue, 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua Schiller

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Benjamin Margulis

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

Thomas Henry Sosnowski

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

#24

22 #4

Exhibit D

22 #2

Exhibit B

22 #1

Exhibit A

#20

#19

#17

#9

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

#1

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff and Defendants, through their undersigned counsel, that: 1. The above-captioned matter is stayed until April 23, 2020, including but not limited to all deadlines relating to: a. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Dkt. 8]; b. Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration [Dkt. 20]; c. The Parties' respective motions to file documents under seal [Dkts. 9, 17]; d. Any obligation under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or the Local Rules of the Southern District of New York to respond to, answer, or move to dismiss the Complaint [Dkt. 1]; and e. The Court's March 2, 2020 Order directing the Parties to file proposed redactions to the documents the Parties sought to file under seal [Dkt. 25]. 2. If the matter is not resolved by April 23, 2020, the Parties shall so inform the Court and submit to the Court a proposed and agreed-to briefing schedule for the aforementioned motions and obligations. 3. Defendants accept service of the Complaint [Dkt. 1]. 4. Facsimile or electronic signatures shall be treated as originals. It is so ORDERED this 10th day of March, 2020. Case stayed. The following deadline(s) was terminated: Response Deadline. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/10/2020) (rjm) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Joshua Gruss, Round Hill Music LP..(Schiller, Joshua) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION to Seal Documents, #9 MOTION to Seal Documents: Responses due by 3/11/2020 (jwh) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER with respect to #9 Motion to Seal; with respect to #17 Motion to Seal: The Court has received motions by the Parties to file certain submissions and documents under seal; in those motions, each Party requests in the alternative to file the submissions and documents in redacted form (see Dkt. Nos. 9-10, 17-19). It is hereby ORDERED that by March 9, 2020, each Party shall file their proposed redacted submissions and documents on ECF, following the procedures set forth in my Individual Practices. Any Party seeking to object to the filing of a submission or document in redacted form shall submit its objection by March 11, 2020. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/2/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #19 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #24 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Joshua Gruss, Round Hill Music LP. Related Document Number: #20 ..(Schiller, Joshua) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ***SELECTED PARTIES***NOTICE of Exhibits A, B and C to Schiller Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed under seal re: #17 MOTION to Seal Documents., #20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration .. Document filed by Joshua Gruss, Round Hill Music LP, Jennifer Scher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B to Schiller Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Exhibit C to Schiller Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #17 .(Schiller, Joshua) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) DECLARATION of Joshua I. Schiller in Support re: #20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration .. Document filed by Joshua Gruss, Round Hill Music LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Schiller, Joshua) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Seal Documents., #20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by Joshua Gruss, Round Hill Music LP, Jennifer Scher. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #17 .(Schiller, Joshua) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Joshua Gruss, Round Hill Music LP.Document filed by Jennifer Scher. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Shulman, Amy) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Round Hill Music LP..(pne) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joshua Gruss..(pne) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joshua Gruss, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jennifer Scher..(Shulman, Amy) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Round Hill Music LP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jennifer Scher..(Shulman, Amy) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Shulman, Amy) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Joshua Gruss, Round Hill Music LP. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18766691)Document filed by Jennifer Scher..(Shulman, Amy) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Round Hill Music, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Margulis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Henry Sosnowski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Schiller