This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2019 at 09:37:56 (UTC).

Schenk v. Allied Van Lines, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2019 Schenk filed an Other - Commerce lawsuit against Allied Van Lines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Glen E. Conrad. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00043

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Commerce

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Glen E. Conrad

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carol Schenk

Defendants

Coleman Worldwide Moving LLC

Allied Van Lines, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jordan Edward McKay

Attorney at Michie, Hamlett, Lowry, Rasmussen & Tweel, P.C.

500 Court Square, Suite 300

Charlottesville, VA 22902

Defendant Attorneys

John Timothy Husk

Attorney at SEATON & HUSK LP

2240 Gallows Road

Vienna, VA 22182

Jeffrey Ellison Cox

Attorney at SEATON & HUSK LP

2240 Gallows Road

Vienna, VA 22182

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice and striking the case from the active docket of the court. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 8/15/19. (jcj)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carol Schenk (McKay, Jordan)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Edward McKay on behalf of Carol Schenk (McKay, Jordan)

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order

7 #1

Supporting Memorandum

#7

(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Allied Van Lines, Inc., Coleman Worldwide Moving LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Jeffrey)

#6

(#6) Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Albemarle General District Court. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 7/16/29. (jcj)

#5

(#5) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coleman Worldwide Moving LLC identifying Corporate Parent Coleman World Group, LLC for Coleman Worldwide Moving LLC. (jcj)

#4

(#4) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allied Van Lines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SIRVA Worldwide, Inc., Corporate Parent SIRVA Intermediate, Inc., Corporate Parent SIRVA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent North American Van Lines, Inc. for Allied Van Lines, Inc.. (jcj)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Consent for Removal by Coleman Worldwide Moving LLC (jcj)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Allied Van Lines, Inc., Coleman Worldwide Moving LLC (jcj)

1 #4

Affidavit of Jeffrey E. Cox

1 #3

Appendix B

1 #2

Appendix A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Albemarle General District Court, case number GV19003930-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400; Receipt 0423-3191771), filed by Allied Van Lines, Inc., Coleman Worldwide Moving LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Affidavit of Jeffrey E. Cox)(jcj)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice and striking the case from the active docket of the court. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 8/15/19. (jcj)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carol Schenk (McKay, Jordan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Edward McKay on behalf of Carol Schenk (McKay, Jordan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Allied Van Lines, Inc., Coleman Worldwide Moving LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Jeffrey)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Albemarle General District Court. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 7/16/29. (jcj)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coleman Worldwide Moving LLC identifying Corporate Parent Coleman World Group, LLC for Coleman Worldwide Moving LLC. (jcj)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allied Van Lines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SIRVA Worldwide, Inc., Corporate Parent SIRVA Intermediate, Inc., Corporate Parent SIRVA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent North American Van Lines, Inc. for Allied Van Lines, Inc.. (jcj)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Consent for Removal by Coleman Worldwide Moving LLC (jcj)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Allied Van Lines, Inc., Coleman Worldwide Moving LLC (jcj)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Albemarle General District Court, case number GV19003930-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400; Receipt 0423-3191771), filed by Allied Van Lines, Inc., Coleman Worldwide Moving LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Affidavit of Jeffrey E. Cox)(jcj)

    Read MoreRead Less