This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2019 at 12:15:58 (UTC).

Scheller v. Nutanix, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 Scheller filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Nutanix, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01651

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ryan Scheller

Bristol County Retirement System

Joseph S. Maroun

Petitioners

David Panczner

City of Birmingham Relief and Retirement System

Ronald Castillo

Jose Flores

Heidi Zapf

Shimon Hedvat

Mamood Sabahi

John Barnes

Frank H. May

Defendants

Duston M. Williams

Nutanix, Inc.

Dheeraj Pandey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Aidan Chowning Poppler

Attorney at Berman Tabacco

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 650

San Francisco, CA 94104

Nicole Catherine Lavallee

Attorney at Berman Tabacco

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 650

San Francisco, CA 94104

James Matthew Wagstaffe

Attorney at Wagstaffe, von Loewenfeldt, Busch & Radwick LLP

100 Pine Street, Suite 725, San Francisco

San Francisco, CA 94111

Francis P McConville

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow LLP

140 Broadway

New York, NY 10005

Lesley F. Portnoy

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

John T. Jasnoch

Attorney at ScottScott Attorneys at Law LLP

600 West Broadway, Suite 3300

San Diego, CA 92101

Jennifer Pafiti

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

1100 Glendon Avenue, Suite 1558

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Joshua Wolf Ruthizer

Attorney at Wolf Popper LLP

845 Third Avenue, 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Robert C. Finkel

Attorney at Wolf Popper LLP

845 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Adam Christopher McCall

Attorney at Levi Korsinsky, LLP

445 S. Figueroa St., 31St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Gregory Mark Nespole

Attorney at Levi Korsinsky

55 Broadway, Level 10

New York, NY 10006

Reed R. Kathrein

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

715 Hearst Avenue, Suite 202

Berkeley, CA 94710

Dillon Joseph Hagius

Attorney at Faruqi and Faruqi LLP

685 Third Ave, Floor 26

New York, NY 10017

Sherief Morsy

Attorney at Faruqi and Faruqi, LLP

685 Third Avenue, 26Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Richard W. Gonnello

Attorney at Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

685 Third Avenue, 26Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Benjamin Heikali

Attorney at Faruqi and Faruqi LLP

10866 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1470

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorneys

Ignacio Evaristo Salceda

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

Boris Feldman

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

 

Court Documents

#87

#47

37 #6

Proposed Order

37 #5

Exhibit 4 to Decl. Hagius

37 #4

Exhibit 3 to Decl. Hagius

37 #1

Declaration Dillon Hagius

#26

22 #1

Proposed Order

#19

8 #1

Notice of Eligibility

#8

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

176 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES AND APPOINTING LEAD PLAINTIFF re #17 , #19 , #22 , #26 , #32 , #35 , #37 , #47 Motions to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Motions to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/10/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2019) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/10/2019 before Judge William H. Orrick by Shimon Hedvat, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (McCall, Adam) (Filed on 7/10/2019) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 7/10/2019 re #17 , #19 , #22 , #32 , #35 , #47 Motions to Consolidate Cases and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. Total Time in Court: 9 minutes. Court Reporter: Marla Knox. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/10/2019) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) Statement of Non-Opposition re #35 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel of Bristol County Retirement System and Joseph S. Maroun filed byBristol County Retirement System, Joseph S. Maroun. (Related document(s) #35 ) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 7/8/2019) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Certificate of Interested Entities by Jose Flores (Ruthizer, Joshua) (Filed on 6/27/2019) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) Order to Continue Case Management Conference by Judge William H. Orrick granting #77 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #61 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Richard W. Gonnello. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #64 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Francis P. McConville. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #62 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Sherif Morsy. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #76 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Joshua W. Ruthizier. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by Ryan Scheller Notice of Plaintiff Ryan Scheller's Announcement of Pending Action Against Nutanix, Inc., as Required by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995 and Civil L.R. 23-1(a) (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 4/5/2019) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Nutanix, Inc., Dheeraj Pandey, Duston M. Williams. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. SEC Class Action Notice due by 4/19/2019. Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2019 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 3/29/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Ryan Scheller (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 3/29/2019) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Aidan Chowning Poppler on behalf of Ryan Scheller (Poppler, Aidan) (Filed on 3/29/2019) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Counsel (Robert C. Finkel) by Nicole Catherine Lavallee on behalf of Ryan Scheller (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 3/29/2019) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Nicole Catherine Lavallee on behalf of Ryan Scheller (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 3/29/2019) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 3/29/2019) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number; 0971-13216763.). Filed by Ryan Scheller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lavallee, Nicole) (Filed on 3/29/2019) Modified on 4/2/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nutanix, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bristol County Retirement System is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sherief Morsy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dillon Hagius Esq.