This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:36:30 (UTC).

Schat v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Schat filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L. Viken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-05076

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey L. Viken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joyce I. Schat

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robin L. Zephier

Attorney at Abourezk, Zephier & LaFleur, P.C.

2020 W. Omaha, Po Box 9460

Rapid City, SD 57709

Defendant Attorney

SaraBeth Donovan

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Rapid City, SD)

515 Ninth Street, Room 201

Rapid City, SD 57701

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es) delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (SLT) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Joyce I. Schat. (Zephier, Robin) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es) delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (SLT) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Joyce I. Schat. (Zephier, Robin) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SaraBeth Donovan on behalf of United States of America. (Donovan, SaraBeth) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#4

(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Plaintiff Joyce I. Schat on Attorney General (Zephier, Robin) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#3

(#3) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued as to USA Acknowledgement filed by Joyce I. Schat. (Zephier, Robin) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

2 #3

AO85

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 AO85)(MSB) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit Administrative Notice of Claim

1 #2

Exhibit Denial Letter

1 #1

Exhibit Federal Tort Claim,

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3197436) filed by Joyce I. Schat in shell case on 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Federal Tort Claim,, #2 Exhibit Denial Letter, #3 Exhibit Administrative Notice of Claim) (MSB) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es) delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (SLT) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Joyce I. Schat. (Zephier, Robin) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es) delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (SLT) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Joyce I. Schat. (Zephier, Robin) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SaraBeth Donovan on behalf of United States of America. (Donovan, SaraBeth) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Plaintiff Joyce I. Schat on Attorney General (Zephier, Robin) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued as to USA Acknowledgement filed by Joyce I. Schat. (Zephier, Robin) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 AO85)(MSB) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3197436) filed by Joyce I. Schat in shell case on 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Federal Tort Claim,, #2 Exhibit Denial Letter, #3 Exhibit Administrative Notice of Claim) (MSB) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less