This case was last updated from PACER on 01/06/2020 at 09:04:52 (UTC).

Schaszberger et al v. American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 Schaszberger filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Malachy E Mannion. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01922

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Malachy E Mannion

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gary Landiak

Kyle Clouse

Colby Conner

Andrew Malene

Bradford Schmittle

Jeanette Hulse

David Schaszberger

Defendant

American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reilly Stephens

Attorney at Liberty Justice Center

190 South Lasalle Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Aaron B Solem

Attorney at c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation

8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600

Springfield, VA 22160

Charles O. Beckley, II

Attorney at Beckley & Madden

212 N. Third St., P.O. Box 11998

Harrisburg, PA 17108-1998

Brian K Kelsey

Attorney at Liberty Justice Center

190 S. Lasalle St.,, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

Richard Griffin

Attorney at Bredhoff & Kaiser, PLLC

805 15Th Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Amy L. Rosenberger

Attorney at Willig, Williams & Davidson

1845 Walnut Street, 24Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

Summons Packet

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/14/19. (bs) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Richard Griffin, Jr.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/14/19. (bs) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Amy L. Rosenberger on behalf of American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13 Attorney Richard Griffin is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4927202.. (Rosenberger, Amy) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L. Rosenberger on behalf of American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13 (Rosenberger, Amy) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13 and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (kpf) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 13 ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4921741), filed by Bradford Schmittle, David Schaszberger, Kyle Clouse, Jeanette Hulse, Gary Landiak, Colby Conner, Andrew Malene. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kpf) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES LOCAL 619 DISTRICT COUNCIL 36 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy L. Rosenberger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Griffin