Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/24/2019 at 08:10:19 (UTC).

Schaffer v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2019 Schaffer filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah S. Vance and Karen Wells Roby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13251

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah S. Vance

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marvin G Schaffer, Sr.

Marvin G. Schaffer, Sr.

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John A. Dalimonte

Attorney at Karon & Dalimonte

85 Devonshire St., Suite 1000

Boston, MA 02109

Paul Lincoln Stoller

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb, LLP

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Joseph R. Joy, III

Attorney at Joseph Joy & Associates

P. O. Box 4929, 900 South College Road, Suite 204

Lafayette, LA 70502

Ashley Carrington Crowell

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb, LLP

1250 Connecticut Ave Nw, #200

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B North, Jr

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLC - Atlanta, GA

201 17Th St. Nw, Ste. 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Lori Gail Cohen

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP (Atlanta)

3333 Piedmont Rd., Ne, Suite 2500

Atlanta, GA 30305

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Alison A. Spindler

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Sylvia Ester Simson

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP (New York)

Metlife Building, 200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Kim E. Moore

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Kelly Juneau Rookard

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

28 #2

Exhibit 2

28 #1

Exhibit 1

#28

(#28) Supplement to ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed on December 17, 2015 by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rookard, Kelly) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#27

(#27) ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney John A. Dalimonte terminated. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 12/13/2019. (mm) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

26 #1

Proposed Order

#26

(#26) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel John Dalimonte by Marvin G. Schaffer, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stoller, Paul) Modified text on 12/13/2019 (mm). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

24 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

24 #1

Proposed Order

#24

(#24) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Counsel of Record Joseph R. Joy, III by Marvin G. Schaffer, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Joy, Joseph) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

5 #9

Miscellaneous Orders

5 #8

Deposition Designation Orders

5 #7

Motions in Limine

5 #6

Daubert Orders

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-04531. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (mp) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#3

(#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Second) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 10/25/2019.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#28) Supplement to ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed on December 17, 2015 by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rookard, Kelly) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Supplement to ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed on December 17, 2015 by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rookard, Kelly) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney John A. Dalimonte terminated. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 12/13/2019. (mm) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel John Dalimonte by Marvin G. Schaffer, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stoller, Paul) Modified text on 12/13/2019 (mm). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear for Attorney Joseph R. Joy, III for Marvin G. Schaffer, Sr. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/27/19. (ko) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll Counsel of Record Joseph R. Joy, III by Marvin G. Schaffer, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Joy, Joseph) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson & Company for C R Bard Incorporated; Corporate Parent C R Bard Incorporated for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (Rookard, Kelly) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Paul Lincoln Stoller. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (sbs) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ashley Carrington Crowell. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (sbs) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Paul L. Stoller (Fee previously paid) by Marvin G. Schaffer, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Oath, #3 Affidavit, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 CMECF Form)(Joy, Joseph) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ashley C. Crowell (Fee previously paid) by Marvin G. Schaffer, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Oath, #3 Affidavit, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 CM/ECF Form)(Joy, Joseph) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/31/19. (ko) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Kim E. Moore, Kelly Juneau Rookard, Alison A. Spindler, David Michael Melancon for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/31/19. (ko) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Richard B. North, Jr. as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record. **Attachment had duplicate description. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Kim E. Moore, David M. Melancon, Kelly Juneau Rookard, and Alison A. Spindler by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) Modified text on 10/29/2019 (mm). (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF FILING SUBMISSION AND JOINT STIPULATION OF DESIGNATION OF RECORD PURSUANT TO JPML RULE 10.4(a) by Plaintiff and Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Submission, #2 New Docket Sheet, #3 Case Management Orders, #4 Discovery Orders, #5 Discovery and Privildge Orders, #6 Daubert Orders, #7 Motions in Limine, #8 Deposition Designation Orders, #9 Miscellaneous Orders, #10 Master and Short-Form Pleadings, #11 New Transmittal Letter)(mp) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-04531. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (mp) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Second) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 10/25/2019.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • (#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-04531-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 10/25/2019.] (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16278357 filed by Marvin G Schaffer, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from azd on 10/25/2019.] (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph R Joy, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ashley Crowell