This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2021 at 08:49:16 (UTC).

Schaefer v. QT Industries LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 Schaefer filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against QT Industries LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ada Brown. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01395

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ada Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heather Schaefer

Defendants

G&A Outsourcing LLC formerly known as G&A Outsourcing Inc doing business as G&A Partners

QT Industries LLC doing business as QT Manufacturing doing business as Quality Tool

G&A Outsourcing Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dale M Rodriguez

Attorney at Law Office of Dale M Rodriguez

Suite 250, 450 Century Parkway

Allen, TX 75013

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Gary Rector

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Zoe Papathanasiou Grisz

Attorney at Clark Hill Strasburger

901 Main Street, Suite 6000

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Proposed Order

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per #10 Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice. (ndt) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Heather Schaefer (Rodriguez, Dale) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading. The deadline for Defendants to file an Answer or other responsive pleading is 8/2/2021. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 7/2/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by G&A Outsourcing LLC, QT Industries LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rector, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zoe Papathanasiou Grisz on behalf of G&A Outsourcing LLC, QT Industries LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Grisz, Zoe) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Gary Rector on behalf of G&A Outsourcing LLC, QT Industries LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Rector, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to G&A Outsourcing LLC; served on 6/18/2021; SUMMONS returned Executed as to QT Industries LLC; served on 6/18/2021. (Rodriguez, Dale) Modified text on 6/23/2021 (jmg). (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to G&A Outsourcing LLC, QT Industries LLC. (mjr) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Heather Schaefer. (Rodriguez, Dale) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Heather Schaefer. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11976800) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Rodriguez, Dale) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dale M Rodriguez