This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/08/2022 at 07:36:59 (UTC).

Scarpati v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 Scarpati filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against GlaxoSmithKline LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robin L. Rosenberg and Bruce E. Reinhart. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-CV-80709

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patsy Scarpati

Defendants

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.

1105 N. Market Street, Suite 622

Wilimington, DE 19801

GlaxoSmithKline plc

Inc Pfizer

BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTCALS, INC.

Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation

900 Ridgebury Rd

Ridgebury, CT 06877

Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation

900 Ridgebury Road

Ridgebury, CT 06877

SANOFI-AVENTIC U.S. LLC

Sanofi US Services Inc.

PATHEON MANUFACTURING SERVICES LLC

CHATTEM, INC.

Pfizer Inc

Sanofi-Aventis US LLC

Patheon Manufacturing Service LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert C. Hilliard

Attorney at Hilliard Martinez Gonzales, LLP

719 S. Shoreline Blvd.

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Katherine D'Aunno-Buchanan

Attorney at Hilliard Martinez Gonzales, LLP

719 S. Shoreline Blvd.

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Steve W. Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro, LLP

1301 2Nd Ave., Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet

#7

(#3) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. All pending motions are hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for the movant to comply with the procedures outlined in Pretrial Order #24, paragraph 10. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. All pending motions are hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for the movant to comply with the procedures outlined in Pretrial Order #24, paragraph 10. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Docket(#2) Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart (mab) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15624273, filed by Patsy Scarpati. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet)(Hilliard, Robert) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Chattem Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sanofi US Services Inc is a litigant