This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2022 at 08:14:00 (UTC).

Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC v. Mobolutions, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Mobolutions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00372

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Mobolutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jay Brett Johnson

Attorney at Kizzia & Johnson PLLC

1910 Pacific Ave, Suite 1300

Dallas, TX 75201

Don Bradley Kizzia

Attorney at Kizzia & Johnson PLLC

1910 Pacific Ave, Suite 1300

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Neil J McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Noel Franco Chakkalakal

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Ricardo Joel Bonilla

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Mobolutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8901978.), filed by Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Patent Asset Management, LLC for Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Mobolutions, LLC. (rpc, ) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC. Mobolutions, LLC served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC by Mobolutions, LLC.(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mobolutions, LLC (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that all claims asserted by the Plaintiff in this action are dismissed with prejudice and all counter-claims asserted by the Defendant in this Action are dismissed without prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/22/2022. (rpc, ) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that all claims asserted by the Plaintiff in this action are dismissed with prejudice and all counter-claims asserted by the Defendant in this Action are dismissed without prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/22/2022. (rpc, ) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2022: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (mcg, ). (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mobolutions, LLC (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC by Mobolutions, LLC.(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Mobolutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC. Mobolutions, LLC served on 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Mobolutions, LLC. (rpc, ) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, ) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Patent Asset Management, LLC for Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mobolutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8901978.), filed by Scanning Technologies Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCANNING TECHNOLOGIES INNOVATIONS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noel F. Chakkalakal

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil J McNabnay

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ricardo Joel Bonilla