This case was last updated from PACER on 02/12/2021 at 10:16:17 (UTC).

Scalia v. Sweet Lemon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 Scalia filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Sweet Lemon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Stearns. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-12217

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Stearns

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eugene Scalia

Defendants

Sweet Lemon, Inc. d/b/a Sweet Lemons Thai Restaurant agent of Sweet Lemons Thai Restaurant

Pornthip Neampong

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Emily Wilkinson

Attorney at Department of Labor

Jfk Federal Building, 25 New Sudbury Street, Room E375

Boston, MA 02203

Mark A. Pedulla

Attorney at U.S. Department of Labor

Jfk Federal Building, Suite E-375

Boston, MA 02203

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eugene Scalia. Pornthip Neampong waiver sent on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021. (Wilkinson, Emily) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eugene Scalia. Sweet Lemon, Inc. waiver sent on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021. (Wilkinson, Emily) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Pedulla on behalf of Eugene Scalia (Pedulla, Mark) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

1 #3

Category Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A to Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: US Government), filed by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Wilkinson, Emily) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eugene Scalia. Pornthip Neampong waiver sent on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021. (Wilkinson, Emily) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eugene Scalia. Sweet Lemon, Inc. waiver sent on 12/14/2020, answer due 2/12/2021. (Wilkinson, Emily) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Pedulla on behalf of Eugene Scalia (Pedulla, Mark) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: US Government), filed by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Wilkinson, Emily) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SWEET LEMONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark A. Pedulla