This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/01/2020 at 10:10:20 (UTC).

Scalia v. Sports-Ortho Urgent Care, PC et al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 Scalia filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Sports-Ortho Urgent Care, PC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aleta A. Trauger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00750

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aleta A. Trauger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eugene Scalia

Defendants

Sports-Ortho Urgent Care, PC doing business as Sports Ortho Urgent Care, Tennessee Sports Medicine and Orthopedics

Carol Kaelin

Charles R. Kaelin, Jr.

Tennessee Sports Medicine and Orthopedics

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schean Griffin Belton

Attorney at U. S. Department of Labor (Nashville Office)

618 Church Street, Suite 230

Nashville, TN 37219-2456

Defendant Attorneys

Charles K. Grant

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC (Nash)

211 Commerce Street, Suite 800

Nashville, TN 37201

Denmark J. Grant

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC (Nash)

211 Commerce Street, Suite 800

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER: The Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference and Extend the Deadline to File Answers (Doc. No. #7 ) is GRANTED. The defendants may have an extension until November 20, 2020 within which to respond to the Complaint. It is further ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for November 2, 2020 is hereby RESET for December 1, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/26/2020. (vh) Modified on 10/27/2020 (vh). (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference and Extend Deadline to File Answers by Carol Kaelin, Charles R. Kaelin, Jr, Sports-Ortho Urgent Care, PC, Tennessee Sports Medicine and Orthopedics. (Grant, Charles) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eugene Scalia. All Defendants. (Belton, Schean) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles K. Grant on behalf of Carol Kaelin, Charles R. Kaelin, Jr, Sports-Ortho Urgent Care, PC, Tennessee Sports Medicine and Orthopedics (Grant, Charles) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2020 at 01:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (vh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

1 #2

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A- Supporting Documentation

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Carol Kaelin, Charles R. Kaelin, Jr, and Sports-Ortho Urgent Care, PC, filed by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Supporting Documentation, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: The Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference and Extend the Deadline to File Answers (Doc. No. #7 ) is GRANTED. The defendants may have an extension until November 20, 2020 within which to respond to the Complaint. It is further ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for November 2, 2020 is hereby RESET for December 1, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/26/2020. (vh) Modified on 10/27/2020 (vh). (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference and Extend Deadline to File Answers by Carol Kaelin, Charles R. Kaelin, Jr, Sports-Ortho Urgent Care, PC, Tennessee Sports Medicine and Orthopedics. (Grant, Charles) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eugene Scalia. All Defendants. (Belton, Schean) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Charles K. Grant and Denmark J. Grant admitted to this court. (vh) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles K. Grant on behalf of Carol Kaelin, Charles R. Kaelin, Jr, Sports-Ortho Urgent Care, PC, Tennessee Sports Medicine and Orthopedics (Grant, Charles) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2020 at 01:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (vh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Schean Griffin Belton. (vh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Carol Kaelin, Charles R. Kaelin, Jr, and Sports-Ortho Urgent Care, PC, filed by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Supporting Documentation, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less