This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:46:35 (UTC).

Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor v. Shooting Gallery Range ,Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Shooting Gallery Range ,Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wendy W. Berger and Leslie R. Hoffman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-02304

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wendy W. Berger

Referral Judge

Leslie R. Hoffman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Secretary of Labor Eugene Scalia

Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor

Defendants

Johnny Lwin

Shooting Gallery Range,Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Monica R. Moukalif

Attorney at US Department of Labor - Office of the Solicitor

Suite 7T10, 61 Forsyth St Sw

Atlanta, GA 30303-8816

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. Consent Judgment is entered. See PDF for details. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/24/2020. (RMF) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of pendency related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor. Related case(s): no (Moukalif, Monica) Modified on 1/24/2020 (BIA). (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor. (Moukalif, Monica) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION to stay the Time Period for the Parties to Submit a Notice of Pendency of Other Actions, Conduct a Case Management Conference, and Submit a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moukalif, Monica) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#5

(#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/24/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/10/2020. (RMF)(ctp). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#4

(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/24/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/10/2020. (RMF)(ctp). (RMF). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Order by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Moukalif, Monica) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moukalif, Monica) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. Consent Judgment is entered. See PDF for details. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/24/2020. (RMF) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of pendency related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor. Related case(s): no (Moukalif, Monica) Modified on 1/24/2020 (BIA). (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor. (Moukalif, Monica) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION to stay the Time Period for the Parties to Submit a Notice of Pendency of Other Actions, Conduct a Case Management Conference, and Submit a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moukalif, Monica) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/10/2020. (RMF)(ctp). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/24/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/10/2020. (RMF)(ctp). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/24/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/10/2020. (RMF)(ctp). (RMF). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:19-cv-2304-Orl-78LRH. (SJB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Order by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Moukalif, Monica) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moukalif, Monica) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less