This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2021 at 08:21:35 (UTC).

SCALIA v. LOCAL 98, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 SCALIA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LOCAL 98, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD A. MCHUGH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00096

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GERALD A. MCHUGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EUGENE SCALIA

Defendant

LOCAL 98, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

615 Chestnut Street, Suite 1250

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAM H. TRASK

Attorney at LAMB MCERLANE PC

One South Broad Street, Suite 1500

Philadelphia, PA 19107

JOSEPH R. PODRAZA, JR.

Attorney at Lamb McErlane PC

One South Broad Street, Suite 1500

Philadelphia, PA 19107

WILLIAM T. JOSEM

Attorney at CLEARY, JOSEM & TRIGIANI LLP

325 Chestnut Street, Suite 200

Philadelphia, PA 19106

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LOCAL 98, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS. (PODRAZA, JOSEPH) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

7 #1

Declaration of Tracy Shanker

#7

(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by EUGENE SCALIA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tracy Shanker)(DEBRUICKER, LAUREN) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LOCAL 98, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS.Brief and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(PODRAZA, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM H. TRASK on behalf of LOCAL 98, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS with Certificate of Service(TRASK, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH R. PODRAZA, JR on behalf of LOCAL 98, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS with Certificate of Service(PODRAZA, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#3

(#3) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 2/12/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 1/20/21. 1/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by EUGENE SCALIA re: George Phillips served Summons and Complaint upon LOCAL 98, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS by service on designated agent. LOCAL 98, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS served on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021. (DEBRUICKER, LAUREN) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against LOCAL 98, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, filed by EUGENE SCALIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(DEBRUICKER, LAUREN) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LOCAL 98, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS. (PODRAZA, JOSEPH) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by EUGENE SCALIA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tracy Shanker)(DEBRUICKER, LAUREN) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LOCAL 98, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS.Brief and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(PODRAZA, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM H. TRASK on behalf of LOCAL 98, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS with Certificate of Service(TRASK, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH R. PODRAZA, JR on behalf of LOCAL 98, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS with Certificate of Service(PODRAZA, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 2/12/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 1/20/21. 1/20/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by EUGENE SCALIA re: George Phillips served Summons and Complaint upon LOCAL 98, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS by service on designated agent. LOCAL 98, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS served on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021. (DEBRUICKER, LAUREN) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to LOCAL 98, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 1/8/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against LOCAL 98, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, filed by EUGENE SCALIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(DEBRUICKER, LAUREN) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAUREN E. DEBRUICKER