This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/19/2020 at 10:47:17 (UTC).

Scalia v. Chester Bross Construction Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 Scalia filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Chester Bross Construction Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patricia L. Cohen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00040

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patricia L. Cohen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eugene Scalia

Defendants

Chester Bross Construction Company 401k Plan

Jeffrey W. Bross

Chester Bross Construction Company

Mark K. Bross

Michael L. Bross

Chester Bross

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elaine Smith

Attorney at US DEPARTMENT OF LABOR - Office of Solicitor Kansas City 2

2300 Main Street, Suite 1020, 2 Pershing Square Building

Kansas City, MO 64108

Defendant Attorney

Heather M. Mehta

Attorney at GREENSFELDER HEMKER PC - St Louis

10 S. Broadway, Suite 2000

St. Louis, MO 63102

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Eugene Scalia. . (Smith, Elaine) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#15

(#15) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Jeffrey W. Bross, Mark K. Bross, Michael L. Bross, Chester Bross, Chester Bross Construction Company, Chester Bross Construction Company 401k Plan.. (Mehta, Heather) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#13

(#13) FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendants Jeffrey W. Bross, Mark K. Bross, Michael L. Bross, Chester Bross, Chester Bross Construction Company, Chester Bross Construction Company 401k Plan, Plaintiff Eugene Scalia. (CLO) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Consent: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. Unless previously submitted, no later than August 20, 2020, each party must submit to the Clerk's Office the consent/option form either consenting to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge or opting to have the case assigned to a United States District Judge. 1. Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 is set for September 23, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/16/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/23/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9N - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 8/20/2020.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 8/17/2020. (CLO) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#11

(#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Heather M. Mehta for Defendants Jeffrey W. Bross, Mark K. Bross, Michael L. Bross, Chester Bross, Chester Bross Construction Company, Chester Bross Construction Company 401k Plan. (Mehta, Heather) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Eugene Scalia Michael L. Bross waiver signed on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Smith, Elaine) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Eugene Scalia Mark K. Bross waiver signed on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Smith, Elaine) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Eugene Scalia Jeffrey W. Bross waiver signed on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Smith, Elaine) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Eugene Scalia Chester Bross waiver signed on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Smith, Elaine) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Eugene Scalia Chester Bross Construction Company waiver signed on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Smith, Elaine) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Eugene Scalia Chester Bross Construction Company 401k Plan waiver signed on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Smith, Elaine) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/29/2020 to correct case number) (CLO). (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#3

(#3) SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint: Original Filing Form by Plaintiff Eugene Scalia. (KXS) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

1 #13

Waiver of Service Waiver of Service

1 #12

Waiver of Service Waiver of Service

1 #11

Waiver of Service Waiver of Service

1 #10

Waiver of Service Waiver of Service

1 #9

Waiver of Service Waiver of Service

1 #8

Waiver of Service Waiver of Service

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Eugene Scalia. . (Smith, Elaine) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Jeffrey W. Bross, Mark K. Bross, Michael L. Bross, Chester Bross, Chester Bross Construction Company, Chester Bross Construction Company 401k Plan.. (Mehta, Heather) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • Docket(#14) Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Review of this case shows the Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate has not been filed by Defendants Chester Bross Construction Company, Chester Bross Construction Company 401k Plan. The certificate must be filed with the Court within 5 days # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 9/4/2020. (JAB) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendants Jeffrey W. Bross, Mark K. Bross, Michael L. Bross, Chester Bross, Chester Bross Construction Company, Chester Bross Construction Company 401k Plan, Plaintiff Eugene Scalia. (CLO) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Consent: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. Unless previously submitted, no later than August 20, 2020, each party must submit to the Clerk's Office the consent/option form either consenting to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge or opting to have the case assigned to a United States District Judge. 1. Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 is set for September 23, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/16/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/23/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9N - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 8/20/2020.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 8/17/2020. (CLO) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENTRY of Appearance by Heather M. Mehta for Defendants Jeffrey W. Bross, Mark K. Bross, Michael L. Bross, Chester Bross, Chester Bross Construction Company, Chester Bross Construction Company 401k Plan. (Mehta, Heather) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Eugene Scalia Michael L. Bross waiver signed on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Smith, Elaine) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Eugene Scalia Mark K. Bross waiver signed on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Smith, Elaine) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Eugene Scalia Jeffrey W. Bross waiver signed on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Smith, Elaine) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Eugene Scalia Chester Bross waiver signed on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Smith, Elaine) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Eugene Scalia Chester Bross Construction Company waiver signed on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Smith, Elaine) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Eugene Scalia Chester Bross Construction Company 401k Plan waiver signed on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Smith, Elaine) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/29/2020 to correct case number) (CLO). (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docket(#4) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint: Original Filing Form by Plaintiff Eugene Scalia. (KXS) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Waivers issued 6. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CLERK'S ORDER (GJL) - The above styled and numbered case was opened on July 21, 2020 and assigned to the Eastern Division. After a review of the case, it was determined the case was assigned incorrectly. The case should have been assigned to the Northern Division. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled case is transferred to the Northern Division and assigned to the Honorable Patricia L. Cohen, United States Magistrate Judge, under cause number 2:20-cv-00040-PLC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that cause number Case No. 4:20-cv-00941-UNA be administratively closed. (MFG) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Secretary of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Notice of Lawsuit, #3 Attachment Notice of Lawsuit, #4 Attachment Notice of Lawsuit, #5 Attachment Notice of Lawsuit, #6 Attachment Notice of Lawsuit, #7 Attachment Notice of Lawsuit, #8 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service, #9 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service, #10 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service, #11 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service, #12 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service, #13 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service)(Smith, Elaine) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chester Bross Construction Co. is a litigant