This case was last updated from PACER on 09/26/2020 at 11:37:42 (UTC).

Scalia, Eugene v. Woldt, Shawn et al

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 Scalia, Eugene filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Woldt, Shawn. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00688

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eugene Scalia

Defendants

Thunderbird Engineering, Inc. 401(k) Plan

Thunderbird Engineering, Inc.

Shawn Woldt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bruce C. Canetti

Attorney at U.S. Department of Labor

230 S. Dearborn St., Rm. 844

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Thunderbird Engineering, Inc. 401(k) Plan. Thunderbird Engineering, Inc. 401(k) Plan waiver sent on 7/28/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Canetti, Bruce) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#4

(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Thunderbird Engineering, Inc.. Thunderbird Engineering, Inc. waiver sent on 7/28/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Canetti, Bruce) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#3

(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Shawn Woldt. Shawn Woldt waiver sent on 7/28/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Canetti, Bruce) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

1 #4

Thunderbird Engineering, Inc. 401(k) Plan Summons

1 #3

Thunderbird Engineering Inc. Summons

1 #2

Waiver of Service of Summons

1 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Waiver of Service of Summons, #3 Thunderbird Engineering Inc. Summons, #4 Thunderbird Engineering, Inc. 401(k) Plan Summons) (Canetti, Bruce) Modified on 7/28/2020. (lak) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Eugene Scalia. (Canetti, Bruce) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketStandard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Thunderbird Engineering, Inc. 401(k) Plan. Thunderbird Engineering, Inc. 401(k) Plan waiver sent on 7/28/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Canetti, Bruce) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Thunderbird Engineering, Inc.. Thunderbird Engineering, Inc. waiver sent on 7/28/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Canetti, Bruce) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Shawn Woldt. Shawn Woldt waiver sent on 7/28/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Canetti, Bruce) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Eugene Scalia. (Canetti, Bruce) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Waiver of Service of Summons, #3 Thunderbird Engineering Inc. Summons, #4 Thunderbird Engineering, Inc. 401(k) Plan Summons) (Canetti, Bruce) Modified on 7/28/2020. (lak) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less