This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/13/2022 at 05:21:42 (UTC).

SCALERCIO-ISENBERG v. CREDIT SUISSE GROUP et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 SCALERCIO-ISENBERG filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against CREDIT SUISSE GROUP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan D. Wigenton and Andre M. Espinosa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02705

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan D. Wigenton

Referral Judge

Andre M. Espinosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHERRY SCALERCIO-ISENBERG

Defendants

CREDIT SUISSE GROUP

Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (SPS)

Mitchell Scott Kurtz, Esq.

Robert D. Bailey, Esq.

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

#2

(#2) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Sherry Scalercio-Isenberg consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Sherry Scalercio-Isenberg..(rdz) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET.(rdz) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#4

(#4) MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING, re: for Permission for Sherry Scalerico-Isenberg to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Sherry Scalercio-Isenberg.(sc) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#5

(#5) TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. A summons shall not issue from this Court. The Clerk of Court is further directed to terminate all pending matters. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/2/22) (rdz) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. (Entered: 05/03/2022)

6 #6

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

6 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (ak, ) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-03208. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. A summons shall not issue from this Court. The Clerk of Court is further directed to terminate all pending matters. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/2/22) (rdz) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING, re: for Permission for Sherry Scalerico-Isenberg to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Sherry Scalercio-Isenberg.(sc) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketPro Se Payment of Fee Processed: $402.00 Credit Card processed by the Finance Department on 04/27/2022, Receipt Number 465401297625. (stt) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET.(rdz) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Sherry Scalercio-Isenberg consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Sherry Scalercio-Isenberg..(rdz) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Robert D. Bailey, Esq, Credit Suisse Group, Mitchell Scott Kurtz, Esq, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (SPS). Document filed by Sherry Scalercio-Isenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit).(rdz) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREDIT SUISSE GROUP, AG is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant