This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/12/2021 at 10:00:57 (UTC).

Scale Video Coding LLC v. Brightcove Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 Scale Video Coding LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Brightcove Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Maria A. Audero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08156

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scale Video Coding LLC

Defendant

Brightcove Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy Devlin

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC

1526 Gilpin Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19806

Jeffrey Francis Craft

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC

1526 Gilpin Avenue

Wilmington, DE 19806

Defendant Attorneys

Jaewon Lee

Attorney at Durie Tangri

953 East 3Rd Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Timothy Chen Saulsbury

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDER RE STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (DKT. 22) approved by Judge John A. Kronstadt re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #22 . Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is continued to 1/21/2022. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

22 #1

Proposed Order

22 #22

Main Document

#21

(#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC, upon Defendant Brightcove Inc. served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren-Authorized to Accept on behalf of registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#20

(#20) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Timothy Devlin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC, designating Jeffrey F Craft as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Timothy Devlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32201083) #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (lt) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

18 #1

Proposed Order

18 #18

Main Document

#17

(#17) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit Ex. B - US11019372 v Brightcove (2021.13.10)

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. A - US11019372

1 #1

Main Document

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER RE STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (DKT. 22) approved by Judge John A. Kronstadt re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #22 . Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is continued to 1/21/2022. (mrgo) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 21, 2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Brightcove Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Timothy Chen Saulsbury added to party Brightcove Inc. (pty:dft))(Saulsbury, Timothy) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC, upon Defendant Brightcove Inc. served on 11/16/2021, answer due 12/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren-Authorized to Accept on behalf of registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Timothy Devlin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC, designating Jeffrey F Craft as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Timothy Devlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32201083) #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (lt) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Timothy Devlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32201083) filed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Craft, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER AND/OR REASSIGNMENT OF PATENT CASE by Judge John F. Walter. Case transferred from Judge John F. Walter to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:21-cv-08156 JAK(MAAx). (rn) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC. Amendment to Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120) #2 (Craft, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Pendency filed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice of Related Case(s) #6 filed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC. Related Case(s): 8:21-cv-01699 2:21-cv-8156 8:21-cv-01700 8:21-cv-01701 8:21-cv-01702 8:21-cv-01704 (Craft, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Plaintiff's NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC, identifying Scale Video Coding LLC Equitable IP Corporation Brightcove Inc.. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC identifying Equitable IP Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Scale Video Coding LLC. (Craft, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32146003 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Scale Video Coding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - US11019372, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - US11019372 v Brightcove (2021.13.10)) (Attorney Jeffrey Francis Craft added to party Scale Video Coding LLC(pty:pla))(Craft, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scale Video Coding LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Brightcove Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Chen Saulsbury